Field v. Exponential Wealth Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dr. David S Field
Defendant: Exponential Wealth Inc., Krystalynne Murnane, Ryan Murnane, Ryan Michaels and Nolan Bennett
Case Number: 1:2021cv01990
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by David S Field, ENDORSEMENT: Time for all defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to June 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/19/2021) Nolan Bennett answer due 6/3/2021; Exponential Wealth Inc. answer due 6/3/2021; Ryan Michaels answer due 6/3/2021; Krystalynne Murnane answer due 6/3/2021; Ryan Murnane answer due 6/3/2021. (ks)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael R. Koblenz dated April 16, 2021 re: Response to Doc # 19. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER from Ryan Murnane, dated 4/14/21 re: I received a copy of a Summons in civil action from Michael R. Koblenz who is the attorney for one of my clients, Dr. David Field of Iowa. I would please ask, if possible, for an extension of time, being that I was never served with these documents until it showed up on my door step on yesterday 4/13/21. If possible, please give me until 6/7/21 for an appropriate response. Document filed by Ryan Murnane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(sc)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Exponential Wealth Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Clerk. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Nolan Bennett served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Daniel Murnane. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Krystalynne Murnane served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Daniel Murnane. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Ryan Michaels served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Daniel Murnane. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Ryan Murnane served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Daniel Murnane. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exponential Wealth Inc...(pc)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krystalynne Murnane..(pc)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nolan Bennett..(pc)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Michaels..(pc)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Murnane..(pc)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nolan Bennett, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Krystalynne Murnane, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Michaels, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Murnane, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Exponential Wealth Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by David S Field..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Fran Lilling on behalf of David S Field..(Lilling, Sara)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Robert Koblenz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Koblenz, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nolan Bennett, Exponential Wealth Inc., Ryan Michaels, Krystalynne Murnane, Ryan Murnane. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24219432)Document filed by David S Field. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21).(Koblenz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. Exponential Wealth Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exponential Wealth Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystalynne Murnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Murnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. David S Field
Represented By: Michael Robert Koblenz
Represented By: Sara Fran Lilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?