Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Trackimo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC
Defendant: Trackimo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02036
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 4/26/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(dt)
April 26, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Trackimo, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay)
April 26, 2021 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Trackimo, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 4/26/2021 (km).
April 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jay Johnson. RE-FILE Document No. #18 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
April 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Notice to Attorney Jay Johnson re: Document #17 Notice (Other), was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions.. (dt)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 4/22/2021 (dt).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER IN A PATENT CASE: The deadline by which the parties may move to amend the pleadings or join any other parties: May 17, 2021; Dates for document requests and initial interrogatories: July 14, 2021; The names of non-expert witnesses expected at this time to be deposed and either specific dates or timetable for when deposition will take place: depositions to be completed no later than August 13, 2021; a date by which all non-expert discovery shall be completed: August 13, 2021; dates by which the disclosures of the identities and reports of experts be required by Rule 26(a)(2) will be made: August 27, 2021; the date by which depositions of experts shall be completed: September 27, 2021, and as further specified and set forth herein. Markman briefing and hearing date: opening papers due Oct. 29, 2021; opposition due Dec. 3, 2021; reply due Dec. 17, 2021. Hearing scheduled Jan. 19, 2022. ANTICIPATED LENGTH OF TRIAL AND WHETHER, AND BY WHOM, A JURY HAS BEEN REQUESTED: 1 week; jury trial requested, and as further set forth in this Scheduling Order in a Patent Case. (Motions due by 10/29/2021. Responses due by 12/3/2021. Replies due by 12/17/2021. Deposition due by 9/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/13/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/15/2021) (rjm)
April 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/15/2021. (Tam, David)
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: The Court shall hold an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on April 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel should contact chambers using the Courts conference line, (877) 873-8017 (Access Code: 5277586). Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/23/2021) (kv)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Trackimo, Inc...(Bienenfeld, Saul)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vistigo Technologies Ltd for Trackimo, Inc.. Document filed by Trackimo, Inc...(Bienenfeld, Saul)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/22/2021) (rjm)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trackimo, Inc...(dnh)
March 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24275113. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24275113. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jay Johnson, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court).(Johnson, Jay)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trackimo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
March 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Jay B. Johnson to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trackimo, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24226599)Document filed by Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC v. Trackimo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trackimo, Inc.
Represented By: Saul Warren Bienenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Positioning Input Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?