LG Capital Funding, LLC v. Nyxio Technologies Corp.
Plaintiff: LG Capital Funding, LLC
Defendant: Nyxio Technologies Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02044
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The May 14, 2021 IPTC is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff must apply for a certificate of default not later than May 14, 2021. No later than 14 days after obtaining a certificate of default, Plaintiff must apply for a default judgment in accordance with this Court's Individual Practices. Additional failures by Plaintiff's counsel to timely file in accordance with this Court's orders and to follow this Court's Individual Practices may result in sanctions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/07/2021) (ama)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference pending Default Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Kevin Kehrli dated May 7, 2021. Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin)
May 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/14/2021. (ama)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The April 23, 2021 IPTC is ADJOURNED to May 14, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is warned, however, to closely heed this Court's orders and Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/19/2021) (ama)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Kevin Kehrli dated April 19, 2021. Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,,, served. Nyxio Technologies Corp. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. Service was accepted by Kris Osborne, Registered Agent. Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2044. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/11/2021) (ks)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nyxio Technologies Corp...(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nyxio Technologies Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC..(Kehrli, Kevin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kehrli, Kevin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nyxio Technologies Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24227751)Document filed by LG Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Board Resolution, #2 Exhibit B - Debt Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Note 1AD, #4 Exhibit D - Wire Instruction 1AD, #5 Exhibit E - TA Letter 1AD, #6 Exhibit F - Wire Confirm 1AD, #7 Exhibit G - SPA, #8 Exhibit H - Note 1NN, #9 Exhibit I - Disbursement 1NN, #10 Exhibit J - Wire Confirm 1NN, #11 Exhibit K - Term Sheet Note 2, #12 Exhibit L - SPA 2, #13 Exhibit M - Note 2, #14 Exhibit N - Disbursement Note 2, #15 Exhibit O - TA Letter Note 2, #16 Exhibit P - Wire Confirm Note 2, #17 Exhibit Q - Board Resolution 2, #18 Exhibit R - SPA 3, #19 Exhibit S - Note 3, #20 Exhibit T - Disbursement Note 3, #21 Exhibit U - TA Note 3, #22 Exhibit V - Wire Confirm Note 3, #23 Exhibit W - 1AD Conversions, #24 Exhibit X - 1NN Conversions, #25 Exhibit Y - Judgment).(Kehrli, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG Capital Funding, LLC v. Nyxio Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyxio Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Kehrli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?