Rodriguez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rodriguez
Defendant: United States of America
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02075
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Schwartz on behalf of United States of America..(Schwartz, Tara)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America..(gp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Rodriguez..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (ad)
March 19, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Gregory M. LaSorsa dated 03/15/2021 re: Transfer of case to Manhattan. Document filed by Elizabeth Rodriguez..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: According to the complaint, the acts and omissions giving rise to this lawsuit all occurred at a facility operated by Urban Health Plan, Inc., located at 1065 Southern Boulevard, Bronx, New York. The complaint contains no allegations regarding plaintiff's residence. Accordingly, it appears that this case may have been improperly designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse. By March 19, 2021, plaintiff's counsel is directed to submit a letter to the Court either acknowledging that this case should be transferred to Manhattan or explaining why the case is properly designated for assignment to White Plains under Rule 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/12/2021) (mml)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America..(gp)
March 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
March 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Martin Beneventano. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (gp)
March 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Thomas Martin Beneventano. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 3/16/2021..(jgo)
March 11, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24235273..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Rodriguez..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Martin Beneventano on behalf of Elizabeth Rodriguez..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beneventano, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA. Document filed by Elizabeth Rodriguez..(Beneventano, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Martin Beneventano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tara Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?