Honda Aircraft Company, LLC et al v. Bank of Utah et al
Plaintiff: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Defendant: Bank of Utah as Owner Trustee of the Matterhorn HondaJet 1 Trust, Apple Bank for Savings and Bank of Utah
Case Number: 1:2021cv02092
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alfred W.J. Marks dated May 3, 2021. Granted. Bank of Utah's response to the Complaint is due by May 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Bank of Utah answer due 5/11/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/04/2021) (ama)
May 3, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alfred W.J. Marks dated May 3, 2021. Document filed by Bank of Utah..(Marks, Alfred)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alfred W.J. Marks dated April 22, 2021 re #6 Complaint. Granted. Defendant Bank of Utah's response to the Complaint is due by May 4, 2021. In the future, requests for extensions of time must be made before the relevant filing deadline has passed. SO ORDERED. Bank of Utah answer due 5/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/22/2021) (va) Modified on 4/23/2021 (va).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER with respect to #20 Letter Motion for Conference re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) - Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John G. McCarthy dated April 21, 2021. The Court will discuss this request with the parties at the Initial conference scheduled for May 26, 2021. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer on this request in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/22/2021) (va)
April 22, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Joseph Heppt on behalf of Apple Bank for Savings..(Heppt, Edward)
April 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Robert Bruno on behalf of Bank of Utah..(Bruno, Gregory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BOU Bancorp, Inc. for Bank of Utah, Bank of Utah. Document filed by Bank of Utah..(Marks, Alfred)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alfred W.J. Marks dated April 22, 2021. Document filed by Bank of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint).(Marks, Alfred)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred W.J. Marks on behalf of Bank of Utah..(Marks, Alfred)
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for May 26, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. Initial Conference set for 5/26/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/21/2021) (va)
April 21, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) - Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John G. McCarthy dated April 21, 2021. Document filed by Apple Bank for Savings..(McCarthy, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Apple Bank for Savings..(McCarthy, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against Bank of Utah., COUNTERCLAIM against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. Document filed by Apple Bank for Savings..(McCarthy, John)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Apple Bank for Savings served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Service was accepted by Shamer Benjamin, authorized agent. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC; American Honda Motor Co., Inc...(Ledwin, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John P Kelly on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Kelly, John)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 MOTION for William J Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/26/2021) (jca)
March 26, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Bank of Utah served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Murphy, authorized employee. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC; American Honda Motor Co., Inc...(Ledwin, Mark)
March 25, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for William J Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24307887. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for William J Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24307887. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William J Katt, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Katt, William)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of William J. Katt in Support re: #11 MOTION for William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24307540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - WJK Supreme Court of Wisconsin Certificate of Good Standing 03.17.21, #2 Exhibit 2 - WJK State of Minnesota in Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing 03...., #3 Exhibit 3 - WJK Supreme Court of Illinois Certificate of Good Standing 03.17.21).(Katt, William) Modified on 3/25/2021 (wb).
March 25, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24307540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Declaration or NOTARIZED AFFIDAVIT;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24307540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Katt, William) Modified on 3/25/2021 (wb).
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Bank for Savings..(dnh)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of Utah..(dnh)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Bank for Savings, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Ledwin, Mark)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Utah as Owner Trustee of the Matterhorn HondaJet 1 Trust, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Ledwin, Mark)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Apple Bank for Savings, Bank of Utah. Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC, American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R).(Ledwin, Mark)
March 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name must match exactly as pleading in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $32,098,671,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (sj)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bank of Utah. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered incorrectly. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Ledwin, Mark) Modified on 3/11/2021 (sj).
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Utah as Owner Trustee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Ledwin, Mark) Modified on 3/11/2021 (sj).
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. Document filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Aircraft Company, LLC..(Ledwin, Mark)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ledwin, Mark)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24233134)Document filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R).(Ledwin, Mark) Modified on 3/11/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC et al v. Bank of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: John P Kelly
Represented By: Mark Gregory Ledwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark Gregory Ledwin
Represented By: William James Katt
Represented By: John P Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Utah as Owner Trustee of the Matterhorn HondaJet 1 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Bank for Savings
Represented By: Edward Joseph Heppt
Represented By: John Gerard McCarthy, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Utah
Represented By: Gregory Robert Bruno
Represented By: Alfred W.J. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?