Ponsler et al v. Oakwood Madison et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Jacob Ponsler and Susan Ponsler
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Reginald Elzey, Oakwood Madison, Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd, Dayton Holdings International Nv, Oakwood Worldwide, LP, Brenda James and ExecuStay Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02125
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sonul Rao dated April 26, 2021. The application is granted. Reginald Elzey answer due 5/28/2021 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/27/2021) (cf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sonul Rao dated April 26, 2021. Document filed by Reginald Elzey..(Rao, Sonul)
April 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonul Rao on behalf of Reginald Elzey, ExecuStay Corp., Oakwood Worldwide, LP..(Rao, Sonul)
April 26, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to ExecuStay Corp...(pc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oakwood Worldwide, LP..(pc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to ExecuStay Corp., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Oakwood Worldwide, L.P., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Charles William Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd c/o Mapletree US Management, LLC, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles) Modified on 3/18/2021 (jgo).
March 16, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reginald Elzey..(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oakwood Worldwide, LP..(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oakwood Madison..(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marriott International, Inc...(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd..(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ExecuStay Corp...(jgo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dayton Holdings International Nv..(jgo)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAYTON HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL NV, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oakwood Worldwide, L.P., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ExecuStay Corp., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marriott International, Inc., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oakwood Madison, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Reginald Elzey, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles William Marino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
March 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Charles William Marino to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately OR one summons may be filed including all of the party names and information on the PDF 'To' section or attaching a 'rider';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dayton Holdings International, N.V., Oakwood Worldwide, L.P., ExecuStay Corp., Marriott International, Inc., Oakwood Madison, Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd, Reginald Elzey, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles) Modified on 3/15/2021 (jgo).
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marino, Charles)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Dayton Holdings International Nv, Reginald Elzey, ExecuStay Corp., Brenda James, Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd, Marriott International, Inc., Oakwood Madison, Oakwood Worldwide, LP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by Susan Ponsler, Stephen Jacob Ponsler..(Marino, Charles)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dayton Holdings International, N.V., Oakwood Worldwide, L.P., ExecuStay Corp., Marriott International, Inc., Oakwood Madison, Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd, Reginald Elzey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Marino, Charles) Modified on 3/15/2021 (jgo).
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Charles William Marino. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 3/17/2021..(jgo)
March 12, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #4 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24243476..(Marino, Charles)
March 12, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #4 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00..(Marino, Charles)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Provda on behalf of Stephen Jacob Ponsler, Susan Ponsler..(Provda, Bruce)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by Susan Ponsler, Stephen Jacob Ponsler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Marino, Charles) Modified on 3/15/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponsler et al v. Oakwood Madison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Elzey
Represented By: Sonul Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapletree Investments Pte Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Holdings International Nv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Worldwide, LP
Represented By: Sonul Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExecuStay Corp.
Represented By: Sonul Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jacob Ponsler
Represented By: Charles William Marino
Represented By: Bruce Provda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ponsler
Represented By: Charles William Marino
Represented By: Bruce Provda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?