Antetokounmpo v. Costantino et al
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Defendant: Christian Small, Jackson Sparks, Sherrie Richardson-Miller, Matthew Luhm, Laikeisha Williams, Jordan Reyes, Jack Constantino, Ryan Biddle, Tyler Buckle and Jack Costantino
Case Number: 1:2021cv02198
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 55 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to SHERRIE RICHARDSON-MILLER.(km)
April 29, 2021 Filing 54 AFFIRMATION of Anastasi Pardalis in Support. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 29, 2021 Filing 53 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 4/29/2021 (km).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Christian Small as a defendant. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting pro se in the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant CHRISTIAN SMALL only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. So Ordered., (Christian Small terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/28/21) (yv)
April 28, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Christian Small. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #51 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (km)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting pro se in the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant RYAN BIDDLE only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Ryan Biddle as a defendant in this case. Ryan Biddle terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/26/2021) (cf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 49 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Ryan Biddle. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 4/26/2021 (dt).
April 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #49 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) GIANNIS ANTETOKOUNMPO and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) LAIKEISHA WILLIAMS. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Laikeisha Williams as a defendant. SO ORDERED, Laikeisha Williams terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/21/2021) (ama) Modified on 4/21/2021 (ama).
April 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
April 20, 2021 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Default Judgement Briefing and Show Cause Hearing served on Ryan Biddle on April 20, 2021. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Melekou, Eleni)
April 20, 2021 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Default Judgement Briefing and Show Cause Hearing served on Sherrie Richardson-Miller on April 20, 2021. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Melekou, Eleni)
April 20, 2021 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling Default Judgement Briefing and Show Cause Hearing served on Christian Small on April 20, 2021. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Melekou, Eleni)
April 20, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Laikeisha Williams. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SCHEDULING DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for default judgment shall be filed, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), no later than May 18, 2021. The Defaulting Defendants shall file any opposition to the motion for default judgment no later than May 25, 2021. If a motion for default judgment is filed, it is further ORDERED that the Defaulting Defendants appear and show cause before this Court, Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, on June 3, 2021, at 3:30 p.m., why an order should not be issued granting a default judgment against the Defaulting Defendants. Prior to that date, Plaintiff must file the proposed default judgment order electronically, using the ECF Filing Event "Proposed Default Judgment," for the Clerk's approval. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff serve Defaulting Defendants via overnight courier (1) with a copy of this Order within one business day of the date of this Order; and (2) with a copy of the motion for default judgment and all supporting papers within one business day of the date of any such motion. In each case, within two business days of service, Plaintiff must file proof of such service on the docket. Because the docket does not reflect service of the Complaint on Defendant Jordan Reyes nor Defendant Tyler Buckle, the initial pretrial conference will proceed as to them as previously scheduled on June 3, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.), ( Motions due by 5/18/2021., Responses due by 5/25/2021) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/20/21) (yv)
April 13, 2021 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ryan Biddle served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Ryan Biddle, Defendant. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 12, 2021 Filing 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting prose in the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant MATTHEW LUHM only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that this stipulation may contain counterparts or facsimile signatures, which shall be deemed as originals. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Matthew Luhm as a defendant., Matthew Luhm terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/2021) (nb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Matthew Luhm. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
April 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #40 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
April 7, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, acting pro se in the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, with prejudice, as to Defendant JACKSON SPARKS only, with each side bearing their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Jackson Sparks as a defendant. Jackson Sparks terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/7/2021) (mro)
April 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #38 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
April 6, 2021 Filing 38 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Jackson Sparks. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 30, 2021 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Christian Small served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service was accepted by Christian Small, Defendant. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 30, 2021 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sherrie Richardson-Miller served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. Service was accepted by Richard Miller, Family. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 30, 2021 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Laikeisha Williams served on 3/27/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 29, 2021 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jackson Sparks served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service was accepted by William Bowman, Roommate. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 29, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jack Costantino served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Jack Costantino, Defendant. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 18, 2021 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laikeisha Williams..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jackson Sparks..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christian Small..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sherrie Richardson-Miller..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordan Reyes..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Luhm..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jack Costantino..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tyler Buckle..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Biddle..(dnh)
March 17, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laikiesha Williams, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jackson Sparks, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christian Small, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sherrie Richardson-Miller, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jordan Reyes, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew Luhm, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jack Costantino, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tyler Buckle, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Biddle, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 3, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/15/21) (yv)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anastasi Pardalis to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anastasi Pardalis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none); Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1125; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
March 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anastasi Pardalis to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; All Defendant's names must be listed correctly and clearly in caption. If all names do not fit, list leading Defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laikiesha Williams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jackson Sparks, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christian Small, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jordan Reyes, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sherrie Richardson-Miller, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew Luhm, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jack Constantino, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tyler Buckle, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Biddle, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Pardalis, Anastasi) Modified on 3/15/2021 (sj).
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Biddle, Tyler Buckle, Jack Constantino, Matthew Luhm, Jordan Reyes, Sherrie Richardson-Miller, Christian Small, Jackson Sparks, Laikeisha Williams. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24245690)Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Pardalis, Anastasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antetokounmpo v. Costantino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie Richardson-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Luhm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laikeisha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Constantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Buckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Costantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Represented By: Anastasi Pardalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?