Chat v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Pee Sho Chat
Respondent: Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv02213
Filed: March 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and without costs or fees to either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/26/2021) (rj)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Pee Sho Chat..(Levine, Zoe)
March 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Zoe Levine to RE-FILE Document #4 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. (km)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pee Sho Chat. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levine, Zoe) Modified on 3/25/2021 (km).
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Waterman, Brandon)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Zoe)
March 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zoe Pokempner Levine. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Zoe Pokempner Levine. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alejandro Mayorkas; Pee Soo Chat; Director Thomas Decker; Merrick Garland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
March 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24247881)Document filed by Pee Soo Chat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B - ICE Form I-830, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Attorney Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Letter of Support, #6 Exhibit F - ICE Decisions to Continue Detention, #7 Exhibit G - Email Correspondence).(Levine, Zoe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chat v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pee Sho Chat
Represented By: Zoe Pokempner Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?