Salaam v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Najah A Salaam
Defendant: John Doe #1-#10, Jane Roe #1-10, John Doe Corporation 1-10 and Jaspal Singh
Case Number: 1:2021cv02222
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Courtney Anne Chadwell on behalf of Jaspal Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service via E-File).(Chadwell, Courtney)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Frances Rush on behalf of Jaspal Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service via E-File).(Rush, Claire)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/16/2021) (jca)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:20-cv-00739. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
March 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
March 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
March 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
March 15, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE of this matter to the District Court for the Southern District of New York, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/12/21. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
March 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Corey Zymet. (FOREMAN, KENNETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/17/21 2:30pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/4/21. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Steve D. Byoun, Esq.. (BYOUN, STEVE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/6/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2020. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 11/6/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/13/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER TO VACATE DEFAULT against Defendant Jaspal Singh and granting leave for Defendant to plead or otherwise defend or move as to the Complaint within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/29/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JASPAL SINGH.(FOREMAN, KENNETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Kenneth Foreman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order to Vacate Default)(FOREMAN, KENNETH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Default by NAJAH A SALAAM against Defendant, Jaspal Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Page, #2 Exhibit E-Filed AOS Def. Singh)(BYOUN, STEVE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
June 24, 2020 **VACATED BY #7 CONSENT ORDER** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JASPAL SINGH for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jc, ) Modified on 6/29/2020 (jc, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
February 13, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The Answer Due Date generated from the filing of #3 Summons Returned Executed has been updated to 2/27/20 as the incorrect event was chosen to file the document and Defendant has 21 days (not 60 days) to respond to the Complaint. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAJAH A SALAAM. JASPAL SINGH served on 2/6/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (BYOUN, STEVE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JASPAL SINGH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JASPAL SINGH, JOHN DOE 1-10, JANE ROE 1-10, JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10299200) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NAJAH A SALAAM.(jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
January 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]
January 30, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 3/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salaam v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-#10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaspal Singh
Represented By: Kenneth R. Foreman
Represented By: Claire Frances Rush
Represented By: Courtney Anne Chadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Najah A Salaam
Represented By: Steve D. Byoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?