Safe Horizon, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Safe Horizons, Inc., ASISTA Immigration Assistance and Safe Horizon, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv02328
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Initial Pretrial Conference held via telephone on 5/12/2021. Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2021. (aba)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emil Natanson Nachman on behalf of ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Nachman, Emil)
April 23, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. The parties should call Toll-Free Number: 877-411-9748 and use Access Code: 9612281. (aba)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Hogan, Alexander)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Safe Horizon, Inc.; ASISTA Immigration Assistance..(Shapiro, Akiva)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation); All such motions: X. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/23/2021) (jca)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (sj)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (sj)
March 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Akiva Shapiro to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party as to whom the summons request is for must be listed first in the "TO" field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) Modified on 3/18/2021 (sj).
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shapiro, Akiva)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24265732)Document filed by Safe Horizons, Inc., ASISTA Immigration Assistance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter).(Shapiro, Akiva)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safe Horizon, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Alexander James Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Alexander James Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safe Horizons, Inc.
Represented By: Akiva Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASISTA Immigration Assistance
Represented By: Akiva Shapiro
Represented By: Emil Natanson Nachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safe Horizon, Inc.
Represented By: Akiva Shapiro
Represented By: Emil Natanson Nachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?