CJ NYC Inc. et al v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: TFS NY Inc. d/b/a Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club, CJ NYC Inc. d/b/a NYC Gentlemen's Club, PRP Restaurant d/b/a Gallagher's 2000, BK Venture Group LTD. d/b/a Starlet's, TFS NY Inc. doing business as Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club, BK Venture Group LTD. doing business as Starlet's, PRP Restaurant doing business as Gallagher's 2000, 7714 Entertainment Corp. and CJ NYC Inc. doing business as NYC Gentlemen's Club
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo and The State Liquor Authority
Case Number: 1:2021cv02388
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Andrew M. Cuomo, The State Liquor Authority with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by PRP Restaurant, CJ NYC Inc., TFS NY Inc., BK Venture Group LTD., 7714 Entertainment Corp.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executive Order 202.3, #2 Exhibit State Liquor Authority Guidelines, #3 Exhibit NY Statewide Contact Tracing Data).(Mermigis, James)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/19/2021) (kv)
March 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Mermigis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PRP Restaurant d/b/a Gallagher's 2000, CJ NYC Inc. d/b/a NYC Gentlemen's Club, TFS NY Inc. d/b/a Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club, BK Venture Group LTD. d/b/a Starlet's, Andrew M. Cuomo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mermigis, James)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Cuomo, The State Liquor Authority. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24274216)Document filed by PRP Restaurant d/b/a Gallagher's 2000, CJ NYC Inc. d/b/a NYC Gentlemen's Club, TFS NY Inc. d/b/a Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club, BK Venture Group LTD. d/b/a Starlet's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executive Order 202.3, #2 Exhibit State Liquor Authority Guidelines, #3 Exhibit NY Statewide Contact Tracing Data).(Mermigis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CJ NYC Inc. et al v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFS NY Inc. d/b/a Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ NYC Inc. d/b/a NYC Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRP Restaurant d/b/a Gallagher's 2000
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BK Venture Group LTD. d/b/a Starlet's
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFS NY Inc. doing business as Sugar Daddy's Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BK Venture Group LTD. doing business as Starlet's
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRP Restaurant doing business as Gallagher's 2000
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7714 Entertainment Corp.
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ NYC Inc. doing business as NYC Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: James Mermigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Liquor Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?