Flynn et al v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: John P. Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn and John P. "Jack" Flynn
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02587
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Sarah L Cave
2 Judge: Arun Subramanian
3 Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #192 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #192 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #185 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Sophia Moskalenko ., #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #187 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs, #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #187 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Jesse Binnall ., #185 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Sophia Moskalenko . SO ORDERED. Responses due by 12/20/2023 Replies due by 1/28/2024.. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/13/2023) (tro)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #185 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Sophia Moskalenko ., #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #187 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Jesse Binnall . addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Jason Greaves dated 11/10/2023. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Greaves, Jason)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order EXHIBIT MATERIALS. As per docket no. 175, received and filed materials in Records room. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(jus)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Jason Greaves dated November 1, 2023 re: #177 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portions of CNN's concurrently-filed Motion for Summary Judgment, addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 27, 2023. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Greaves, Jason)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #177 Letter Motion to Seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/31/2023) (jca)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Conventionally Filed Exhibits re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude Dr. Sophia Moskalenko, served on the Clerk of Court and the Honorable Arun Subramanian on October 27, 2023. Service was made by hand delivery. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #187 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Jesse Binnall . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Jesse Binnall . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #185 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Sophia Moskalenko . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Sophia Moskalenko . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 DECLARATION of Katherine M. Bolger in Support re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CNN Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oath Video, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Donie O'Sullivan, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Fuzz Hogan, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Emma Lacey-Bordeaux, #6 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of Mike Rothschild, #7 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Terri D. Giddens, Ph.D., #8 Exhibit 8 - PASTELS AND PEDOPHILES: INSIDE THE MIND OF QANON, #9 Exhibit 9 - CNN001729, #10 Exhibit 10 - CNN001737, #11 Exhibit 11 - CNN001070-CNN001086, #12 Exhibit 12 - CNN000689, #13 Exhibit 13 - CNN001442, #14 Exhibit 14 - CNN001238-CNN001242, #15 Exhibit 15 - CNN001602-CNN001604, #16 Exhibit 16 - CNN000901-CNN000902, #17 Exhibit 17 - CNN000892-CNN000893, #18 Exhibit 18 - CNN000894-CNN000896, #19 Exhibit 19 - CNN000888-CNN000891, #20 Exhibit 20 - CNN000143-CNN000149, #21 Exhibit 21 - CNN000339, #22 Exhibit 22 - CNN000691-CNN000693, #23 Exhibit 23 - CNN001326-CNN001327, #24 Exhibit 24 - CNN000752-CNN000757, #25 Exhibit 25 - CNN001014, #26 Exhibit 26 - PX_189; 8:51:18 PM, #27 Exhibit 27 - PX_189; 9:42:20 PM, #28 Exhibit 28 - John P. "Jack" Flynn Dep. Tr., #29 Exhibit 29 - Leslie Flynn Dep. Tr., #30 Exhibit 30 - Valerie Flynn Dep. Tr., #31 Exhibit 31 - General Michael Flynn Dep. Tr., #32 Exhibit 32 - Lori Flynn Dep. Tr., #33 Exhibit 33 - Barbara Flynn Redgate Dep. Tr., #34 Exhibit 34 - Jeffrey Pedersen Dep. Tr., #35 Exhibit 35 - Tracy Diaz Dep. Tr., #36 Exhibit 36 - J.T. Wilde Dep. Tr., #37 Exhibit 37 - Wilson Powell Dep. Tr., #38 Exhibit 38 - PX_250, #39 Exhibit 39 - PX_289, #40 Exhibit 40 - Leslie Flynn Tweet, #41 Exhibit 41 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #42 Exhibit 42 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #43 Exhibit 43 - @FlynnJack515 Wayback Capture, #44 Exhibit 44 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #45 Exhibit 45 - Leslie Flynn Tweet, #46 Exhibit 46 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #47 Exhibit 47 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #48 Exhibit 48 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #49 Exhibit 49 - PX_180, #50 Exhibit 50 - TNS0012776-TNS0012778, #51 Exhibit 51 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #52 Exhibit 52 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #53 Exhibit 53 - TNS0012798-TNS0012799, #54 Exhibit 54 - PX 578, #55 Exhibit 55 - @GoJackFlynn Archive.Today Capture, #56 Exhibit 56 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #57 Exhibit 57 - TNS0002173-TNS0002174, #58 Exhibit 58 - @FlynnJack515 Wayback Capture, #59 Exhibit 59 - @FlynnJack515 Wayback Capture, #60 Exhibit 60 - @FlynnJack515 Wayback Capture, #61 Exhibit 61 - @FlynnJack515 Wayback Capture, #62 Exhibit 62 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #63 Exhibit 63 - PX_200, #64 Exhibit 64 - @GoJackFlynn Wayback Capture, #65 Exhibit 65 - PX_0718-PX_0720, #66 Exhibit 66 - @MadMerlin5 Tweet, #67 Exhibit 67 - Rumble Screenshot, #68 Exhibit 68 - Jack Flynn Retweet, #69 Exhibit 69 - PX_102-108, #70 Exhibit 70 - @WgaBrittany Wayback Capture, #71 Exhibit 71 - @CourtSalinas Wayback Capture, #72 Exhibit 72 - PX_599, #73 Exhibit 73 - @lofly727 Wayback Capture, #74 Exhibit 74 - PX_599, #75 Exhibit 75 - PX_0674-PX_0676, #76 Exhibit 76 - @intheMatrixxx Wayback Capture, #77 Exhibit 77 - PX_581, #78 Exhibit 78 - Plaintiffs' Objections and Answers to Defendant's Interrogatories, #79 Exhibit 79 - Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, #80 Exhibit 80 - Q Drop 513, #81 Exhibit 81 - Q Drop 1183, #82 Exhibit 82 - Q Drop 2147, #83 Exhibit 83 - Q Drop 3924, #84 Exhibit 84 - Q Drop 4506, #85 Exhibit 85 - Q Drop 4510, #86 Exhibit 86 - Q Drop 4881, #87 Exhibit 87- Media Matters Article, #88 Exhibit 88 - Daily Beast Article, #89 Exhibit 89 - AP Article, #90 Exhibit 90 - Chicago Tribune Article, #91 Exhibit 91 - 3rd Party Reporting, #92 Exhibit 92 - CNN Article, #93 Exhibit 93 - Washington Examiner Article, #94 Exhibit 94 - Salon Article, #95 Exhibit 95 - Daily Mail Article, #96 Exhibit 96 - CNN Article, #97 Exhibit 97 - CNN Article, #98 Exhibit 98 - CNN Article, #99 Exhibit 99 - @donie Tweet, #100 Exhibit 100 - @donie Tweet, #101 Exhibit 101 - @donie Tweet, #102 Exhibit 102 - Jack Flynn Q Photo, #103 Exhibit 103 - PX_274-PX_288, #104 Exhibit 104 - Plaintiff Leslie Flynn's Answer to Defendant's Fourth Interrogatory, #105 Exhibit 105 - Twitter Blog Post, #106 Exhibit 106 - FLYNN0000010-FLYNN0000012, #107 Exhibit 107 - PX_189; 9:44:02 PM, #108 Exhibit 108 - PX_427, #109 Exhibit 109 - PX_203-PX_209, #110 Exhibit 110 - Rumble Screenshot, #111 Exhibit 111 - Internet forum postings [Part 1], #112 Exhibit 111 - Internet forum postings [Part 2], #113 Exhibit 112 - Jennifer Freitas Dep. Tr., #114 Exhibit 113 - PX_0674-PX_0676, #115 Exhibit 114 - Expert Report of Dr. Sophia Moskalenko, #116 Exhibit 115 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Sophia Moskalenko, #117 Exhibit 116 - Dr. Sophia Moskalenko Dep. Tr., #118 Exhibit 117 - Expert Report of Jesse R. Binnall, #119 Exhibit 118 - Jesse R. Binnall Dep. Tr.).(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment . [REDACTED]. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Katherine M. Bolger [with Confidential Exhibits] in Support re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of Mike Rothschild, #2 Exhibit 28 - John P. "Jack" Flynn Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 29 - Leslie Flynn Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit 30 - Valerie Flynn Dep. Tr., #5 Exhibit 31 - General Michael Flynn Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit 32 - Lori Flynn Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit 33 - Barbara Flynn Redgate Dep. Tr., #8 Exhibit 34 - Jeffrey Pedersen Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit 35 - Tracy Diaz Dep. Tr., #10 Exhibit 36 - J.T. Wilde Dep. Tr., #11 Exhibit 38 - PX_250, #12 Exhibit 39 - PX_289, #13 Exhibit 40 - Leslie Flynn Tweet, #14 Exhibit 49 - PX_180, #15 Exhibit 50 - TNS0012776-TNS0012778, #16 Exhibit 53 - TNS0012798-TNS0012799, #17 Exhibit 54 - PX 578, #18 Exhibit 57 - TNS0002173-TNS0002174, #19 Exhibit 65 - PX_0718-PX_0720, #20 Exhibit 69 - PX_102-108, #21 Exhibit 72 PX_599, #22 Exhibit 74 - PX_599, #23 Exhibit 75 - PX_0674-PX_0676, #24 Exhibit 77 - PX_581, #25 Exhibit 79 - Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, #26 Exhibit 103 - PX_274-PX_288, #27 Exhibit 106 - FLYNN0000010-FLYNN0000012, #28 Exhibit 112 Jennifer Freitas Dep. Tr., #29 Exhibit 113 - PX_0674-PX_0676)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #177 .(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portions of CNN's concurrently-filed Motion for Summary Judgment, addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 27, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel should first try to email the materials to SubramanianNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the materials are too large to be attached, they should be delivered by USB drive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/23/2023) (jca)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File conventionally by delivery to the Clerk of Court. addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Katherine M. Bolger dated 10/23/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #173 Motion for Jared J. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/11/2023) (vfr)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #173 MOTION for Jared J. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28402833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Jared J. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28402833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Local Rule 1.3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Roberts, Jared)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #171 MOTION for Jason C. Greaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jason C. Greaves, for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/6/2023) (jca)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION for Jason C. Greaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28392032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason C. Greaves, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for PHV).(Greaves, Jason)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #171 MOTION for Jason C. Greaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28392032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** ORDER granting #169 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The request is GRANTED. The Court thanks the parties for their courtesy to one another and wishes for a speedy recovery for Mr. Biss. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to restrict viewing access of this order on the docket to the Court and the parties. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 169. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 9/12/2023) (vfr)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arun Subramanian: Discovery Hearing held on 9/12/2023. Alex Rissmiller present for Plaintiff. Emily R. Pidot and Aaron Mark Zeisler present for Defendants. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (kh)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/27/2023. (vfr)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ***SELECTED PARTIES***JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive and Daubert Motions in compliance with The Honorable Judge Arun Subramanian's rules in practice section 11(A) & (B), addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 11, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #168 .(Bolger, Katherine)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REDACTION Joint Letter-Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive and Daubert Motions, by Cable News Network, Inc..(Bolger, Katherine)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 9/11/2023) (tg)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 8, 2023 re: Deposition of Barbara Redgate. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case..(kgo)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: granting #163 Letter Motion for Conference re: #163 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Defendant's intended Motion for Summary Judgment. addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine M. Bolger dated August 1, 2023., #164 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File Summary Judgment Motions and to Extend Motion Page Limits addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine M. Bolger dated August 1, 2023. ; granting #164 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has filed two letters requesting a pre-motion conference to discuss an anticipated motion for summary judgment, to extend the parties' deadline to file any motions for summary judgment, and to request extra pages for opening and opposition briefings for any summary-judgment motions. See Dkt. Nos. 163-164. Those requests are GRANTED as follows. First, in lieu of a pre-motion conference, the Court hereby permits either party to file summary-judgment motions. Second, in accordance with Defendant's request, the deadline for either party to file and serve a motion for summary judgment is September 25, 2023. Any opposition to a filed summary-judgment motion is due no later than four weeks from the date that the motion is filed and served; replies, if any, are due no later than two weeks after the date of service of the relevant opposition. Third, in accordance with Defendant's request, memoranda of law in support of and in opposition to any summary-judgment motion must be no longer than forty pages each. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 163 and 164.SO ORDERED.( Motions due by 9/25/2023.). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/01/2023) (ama)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File Summary Judgment Motions and to Extend Motion Page Limits addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine M. Bolger dated August 1, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Pre-Motion Conference for Defendant's intended Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine M. Bolger dated August 1, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #155 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; granting in part and denying in part #156 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The Court deems a conference unnecessary at this time, and orders as follows: 1. By August 3, 2023, Defendant may serve an interrogatory on Plaintiff Leslie Flynn ("Ms. Flynn") regarding how her February 6, 2021 text messages with Mary Ellen Sullivan (the "Feb. 6 Texts") were deleted or not preserved. Ms. Flynn shall provide a sworn response by August 10, 2023. 2. Defendant may continue its efforts to serve a subpoena on Barbara Redgate, and, if successful, may depose her despite the fact that discovery is closed. By September 8, 2023, Defendant shall file a letter advising of the status of its efforts to serve and depose Ms. Redgate. 3. The Court deems all discovery closed as of July 7, 2023, apart for the limited fact discovery permitted by this order. 4. Defendant's Motion is otherwise DENIED. 5. To the extent either party seeks to file a motion for summary judgment, the parties are referred to the Individual Rules of the Honorable Gregory H. Woods. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 155 and ECF No. 156. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/27/23) (yv)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated July 17, 2023 re: #156 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference (Discovery conference on two outstanding issues) (REDACTED VERSION), addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated July 12, 2023. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger, Deanna K. Shullman, and Steven S. Biss dated July 14, 2023 re: Joint Letter Certifying Completion of Fact and Expert Discovery per Court Order (Dkt. 138) Pending CNN's Letter-Motion (Dkt. 155). Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: denying without prejudice to renewal #153 Letter Motion to Compel. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal following a determination by the Court whether Dr. Moskalenko will serve as an expert or fact witness in this action. Plaintiffs request for attorneys' fees is DENIED.The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 153. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/13/2023) (ama)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #154 Letter Motion to Seal. The letter-motion at ECF No. 154 to file a document under seal and publicly with redactions is GRANTED. The document filed at ECF No. 155 shall remain as only visible to the selected parties, with the document filed at ECF No. 156 visible to the public. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 154. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/12/23) (yv)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated July 12, 2023 re: #153 LETTER MOTION to Compel CNN to to pay Plaintiffs' expert witness pursuant to Rule 26(b)(4)(E) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated July 10, 2023. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference (Discovery conference on two outstanding issues) (REDACTED VERSION), addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated July 12, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference (Discovery conference on two outstanding issues), addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated July 12, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #154 .(Bolger, Katherine)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portions of CNN's concurrently-filed letter- motion, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated July 12, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 LETTER MOTION to Compel CNN to to pay Plaintiffs' expert witness pursuant to Rule 26(b)(4)(E) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated July 10, 2023. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #148 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant requests leave to file its reply letter in further support of its motion for a conference (ECF No. 149) under seal, with a redacted version (ECF No. 150) filed publicly on the docket. (ECF No. 148). The request is GRANTED. The document filed at ECF No. 149 shall remain as only visible to the selected parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 148. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/20/23) (yv)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying #143 Letter Motion for Conference re: #143 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023., #144 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. ; denying #144 Letter Motion for Conference re: #143 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023., #144 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. The Court DENIES Defendant's request for a conference, and orders as follows: (1) By June 26, 2023, Defendant may serve up to five (5) additional interrogatories on Plaintiff Jack Flynn ("Mr. Flynn") regarding which repositories he has searched in connection with the two requests referenced in Defendant's reply letter (see ECF No 149 at 1), including whether Mr. Flynn has searched the phone he used in July 2020. (2) By July 3, 2023, Mr. Flynn shall provide sworn responses to the additional interrogatories. To the extent that Mr. Flynn identifies additional documents responsive to the two requests, he shall produce them to Defendant together with the interrogatory responses. By June 27, 2023, Plaintiff Leslie Flynn ("Ms. Flynn") shall update her interrogatory response(s) related to her communications with Mary Ellen Sullivan ("Ms. Sullivan") and produce the February 6, 2021 text message from Ms. Sullivan. If Ms. Flynn no longer possesses the February 6, 2021 text message, she shall explain why in her updated interrogatory responses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 143 and ECF No. 144. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/20/23) (yv)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated June 20, 2023 re: #143 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated June 20, 2023 re: #143 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #148 .(Bolger, Katherine)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portions of CNN's concurrently-filed reply letter-motion, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated June 20, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated June 16, 2023 re: #144 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's letter-motion for a discovery conference. (ECF No. 143). Plaintiffs shall file a response by June 20, 2023, at 5:00 p.m. Defendant shall file any reply by June 21, 2023, at 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 6/21/2023., Responses due by 6/20/2023) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/16/2023) (vfr)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #142 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant requests leave to file under seal its letter-motion at ECF No. 143, with a redacted version filed publicly on the docket at ECF No. 144. (ECF No. 142). Defendant's request is GRANTED. The document filed at ECF No. 143 shall remain as visible only to the selected parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/13/23) (yv)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #142 .(Bolger, Katherine)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(e) and 26(c), and the Judges' individual practice rule 1.F addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/12/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying without prejudice #140 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant's letter-motion (ECF No. 140) to file its forthcoming letter-motion under seal is DENIED without prejudice to make the same request at the time the letter-motion is filed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 140. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 6/12/2023) (jca)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portion of CNN's forthcoming letter-motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated June 9, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of (Service of Plaintiffs' Second Expert Witness Disclosure) re: #138 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,,,. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN granting #135 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' request for an extension of expert discovery deadlines (ECF No. 135) and Defendant's response (ECF No. 137). Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED, and the Court orders as follows: 1. By June 5, 2023, the parties shall serve their expert disclosures. 2. By June 20, 2023, the parties shall serve their rebuttal expert disclosures. 3. By July 7, 2023, all discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed. 4. By July 14, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter certifying the completion of all discovery, and advising whether they request a settlement conference with the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 135. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 7/7/2023. Discovery due by 7/7/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/12/23) (yv)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated May 12, 2023 re: #135 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 10, 2023. (Pursuant to this Court's Order (ECF No. #136 )). Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re: #135 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 10, 2023. filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #135 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 10, 2023. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' request for an extension of expert discovery deadlines. (ECF No. 135). Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. is directed to respond to Plaintiffs' request at ECF No. 135 by May 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. : ( Responses due by 5/12/2023) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/11/23) (yv)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated May 10, 2023. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: granting #133 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties' requested extension of the expert discovery schedule (ECF No. 133) is GRANTED, and the Court orders as follows:1. By May 24, 2023, the parties shall serve their expert disclosures. 2. By June 9, 2023, the parties shall serve their rebuttal expert disclosures. 3. By June 23, 2023, all discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed. 4. By June 30, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter certifying the completion of all discovery, and advising they request a settlement conference with the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 133. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 6/23/2023. Discovery due by 6/23/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 4/20/2023) (ama)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: Expert Discovery Deadlines, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated April 19, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER terminating #128 Letter Motion for Discovery. Pursuant to the telephonic discovery conference held today, March 21, 2023, the Court orders as follows: 1. To the extent the pre-conference letters of Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN") (ECF Nos. 128-29) sought productions from Plaintiff Leslie A. Flynn ("Ms. Flynn"), the Court orders as follows: a. By Tuesday, March 28, 2023, CNN shall provide an updated set of instructions for Plaintiffs' counsel to download Ms. Flynn's Facebook data (the "Data"). Plaintiffs' counsel shall then promptly re-produce the Data to CNN. b. In light of Ms. Flynn's production of her medical records-which have been produced as to one medical provider, and are forthcoming as to the second- CNN's request that Ms. Flynn be compelled to execute HIPAA consent forms is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. c. Plaintiffs' counsel shall (i) ask Kyle Saulnier ("Mr. Saulnier") and Ms. Flynn whether any outstanding responsive communications remain, (ii) produce any outstanding responsive communications, and (iii) certify that Ms. Flynn have produced all outstanding responsive communications. d. CNN's request that certain documents withheld as privileged be produced is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and by Tuesday, March 28, 2023, Plaintiffs' counsel shall produce to CNN documents 32 and 38 as numbered on Plaintiffs' privilege log. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 128. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/21/2023) (tg)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2023. Attorney Steven S. Biss appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys Katherine Mary Bolger and Lindsey Blair Cherner appeared on behalf of Defendant. (ne)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Privilege List Under Seal re: #130 Order on Motion for Discovery,. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #130 .(Bolger, Katherine)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Letter Motion for Discovery. By Monday, March 20, 2023, Defendant Cable News Network shall file under seal the portions of the privilege logs showing the entries that are in dispute. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/17/2023) (rro)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: additional discovery disputes requiring the Court's attention at the Discovery Conference on March 21, 2023 [REDACTED], addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated March 16, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: additional discovery disputes requiring the Court's attention at the Discovery Conference on March 21, 2023, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated March 16, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #127 .(Bolger, Katherine)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant's letter-motion seeking to file under seal its forthcoming letter-motion that discusses Leslie Flynn's medical condition and Plaintiffs' privilege log (the "Letter-Motion") (ECF No. 126) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file the Letter-Motion and a proposed redacted versions of the Letter-Motion by today, Thursday, March 16, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 126. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/16/2023) (va)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/16/2023. (va)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 LETTER MOTION to Seal the redacted portion of CNN's forthcoming letter-motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated March 15, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/21/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/21/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/21/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Adrienne Mignano, 92120 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2023. (js)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2023. Attorney Steven Biss appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys Katherine Bolger and Deanna Shullman appeared on behalf of Defendant. (ne)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying #110 Letter Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice #112 Letter Motion for Discovery. The Court orders as follows: 1. To the extent the pre-conference letters of Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN") (ECF Nos. 104; 105) sought production from Plaintiffs John P. "Jack" Flynn ("Jack") and Leslie A. Flynn (together, the "Flynns"), the Court orders as follows: a. CNN shall provide the Flynns with a list of five to ten (5-10) search terms, which Plaintiffs shall apply to (i) the Telegram accounts of Jack and Laurie Flynn; and (ii) the WhatsApp accounts of the Flynns. b. Plaintiffs' counsel shall re-produce the data downloaded for the Twitter handle @JosephJFlynn1. 2. Plaintiffs' letter-motion seeking to compel the deposition of Anderson Cooper (ECF No. 110) is DENIED. Plaintiffs may renew their application to the extent they can provide evidence that would satisfy the standard set forth in New York Times Co. v. Sullivan, 376 U.S. 254 (1964), as discussed in the Conference. 3. By Tuesday, February 28, 2023, Plaintiffs' counsel shall provide to CNN the screenshots demonstrating attempts to access and download Twitter data, which CNN shall provide to Twitter. CNN's letter-motion to compel the Flynns to download the Twitter data for the outstanding accounts, outlined in ECF No. 112 and discussed in the Conference (ECF No. 112), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 4. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed by Thursday, May 18, 2023, and by Thursday, May 25, 2023, the parties must file a joint letter on the docket certifying that all discovery is complete. a. The parties shall simultaneously exchange the disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on Monday, April 24, 2023 for principal expert reports. The parties shall simultaneously exchange rebuttal expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on Monday, May 8, 2023. b. All expert depositions shall be completed by Thursday, May 18, 2023. 5. The parties shall order a transcript of the Conference and file it on the docket. The parties shall submit a single request to: etranscripts@nysd.uscourts.gov by Friday, February 24, 2023. 6. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 110 and 112. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/21/2023) (vfr)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated February 14, 2023 re: #104 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn, Cable News Network, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #118 .(Biss, Steven)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #118 Letter Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' letter-motion seeking leave to file under seal the unredacted version of their response to Defendant's February 9, 2023 letter (the "Unredacted Response") (ECF No. 118) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file the Unredacted Response, in accordance with the Court's order dated February 17, 2023. (ECF No. 116). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 118. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/19/23) (yv)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant's letter-motion seeking to seal their reply letter (ECF No. 111), which contains information designated by Plaintiffs as "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the parties' March 15, 2022 Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order, (ECF No. 117) is GRANTED. The document at ECF No. 111 shall remain visible only to the selected parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 117. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/21/23) (yv)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 5/18/2023. Discovery due by 5/18/2023. Expert Discovery due by 5/18/2023. (vfr)
February 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated February 18, 2023. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Return Date set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM..(Biss, Steven)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 LETTER MOTION to Seal Redacted Portion of Defendant's Reply Letter-Motion (ECF No. 113) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 17, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER, By 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, February 21, 2023, CNN shall file a letter-motion explaining the grounds for sealing the Reply, and Plaintiffs shall file (i) a letter-motion explaining the grounds for partial sealing of the Response; and (ii) the Unredacted Response. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 2/21/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/17/23) (yv)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 17, 2023 re: Request for the parties to discuss the expert discovery deadline in this action at the conference scheduled for February 21, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 16, 2023 re: #110 LETTER MOTION to Compel CNN to provide dates for the deposition of Anderson Cooper addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated February 14, 2023. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 16, 2023 re: #105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. Response to Plaintiffs' letter-motion dated February 14, 2023 (Dkt. 109) [REDACTED]. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Deanna K. Shullman dated February 16, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Shullman, Deanna)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 16, 2023 re: #105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. Response to Plaintiffs' letter-motion dated February 14, 2023 (Dkt. 109). Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #106 .(Bolger, Katherine)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 LETTER MOTION to Compel CNN to provide dates for the deposition of Anderson Cooper addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated February 14, 2023. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Return Date set for 2/21/2023 at 04:00 PM..(Biss, Steven)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated 02/14/2023 re: #105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant Cable News Network's letter-motion requesting adjournment of the telephonic conference scheduled for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. (the "Conference") (ECF No. 107) is GRANTED, and the Conference is ADJOURNED to Tuesday, February 21, 2023 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. By 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 16, 2023, any party wishing to do so may file a letter of no longer than three (3) pages listing discovery disputes requiring the Court's attention. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 107. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/13/2023) (tg)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / telephone status conference scheduled for February 21, 2023 at 10:00 am, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated February 13, 2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #103 Letter Motion to Seal; granting #104 Letter Motion for Conference re: #103 LETTER MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(e) and 26(c), and the Judges' individual practice rule 1.G addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023., #104 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023., #105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.); granting #105 Letter Motion for Conference re: #103 LETTER MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(e) and 26(c), and the Judges' individual practice rule 1.G addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023., #104 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023., #105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. The Motions are GRANTED, as follows: 1. The document at ECF No. 104 shall remain visible only to the selected parties. 2. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m., on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. By 5:00 pm on Thursday, February 16, 2023, any party wishing to do so may file a letter of no longer than three (3) pages listing discovery disputes requiring the Court's attention. 3. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF Nos. 103-05. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/10/23) (yv) Modified on 3/2/2023 (yv).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference. (REDACTED) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Conference / Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #103 .(Bolger, Katherine)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 LETTER MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(e) and 26(c), and the Judges' individual practice rule 1.G addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 2/9/2023. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' letter-motion seeking an extension of time to complete their search of the email accounts specified in the November 23, 2022 order (ECF No. 101) is GRANTED. By Tuesday, January 3, 2022, Plaintiffs shall complete their search of the emails and produce all relevant documents. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 101.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/15/22) (yv)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Counsel's Review of Email Accounts addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated December 15, 2022. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OPINION AND ORDER re: #80 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 4, 2022. filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn. For the reasons set forth above, by Friday, December 9, 2022, CNN shall produce to the Flynns the Emails numbered 5, 10, 11, 13, 14, 16, 22, 23, 26, 28, 29, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 48, 49, 74, 81, 84, 85, and 86 on the Logs. (ECF No. 86). The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 80. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/5/22) (yv)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/23/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2023.(js)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #95 Letter Motion for Discovery. Pursuant to the telephonic discovery conference held today, November 23, 2022 (the "Conference"), the Court orders as follows: 1. The fact discovery deadline is EXTENDED to April 17, 2023. Within one week of the close of fact discovery, that is by April 24, 2023, the parties must file a joint letter on the docket certifying that fact discovery is complete. 2. With respect to the pre-conference letter submitted by Plaintiffs John P. "Jack" Flynn and Leslie A. Flynn (the "Flynns") (ECF No. 95), the Court orders as follows: a. Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN") shall produce any remaining documents relating to CNN's ratings and viewership of the Report (ECF No. 1 Paragraph 4). b. CNN shall conduct a reasonable search for and produce copies of the "Special Report[s]" hosted by Anderson Cooper that aired on (i) January 31, 2021, and (ii) February 26, 2021. c. CNN will confirm that Donie O'Sullivan's ("O'Sullivan") social media accounts were searched for mentions of the Flynns, and CNN shall produce any additional responsive documents. d. The Flynns' requests for documents concerning the positions CNN has taken in prior reports regarding what constitutes a "QAnon follower," and O'Sullivan's employment agreement(s) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. e. The Court DENIES the Flynns' remaining requests for: i. "Dossiers and research on Trump, General Flynn or QAnon;" ii. "Communications with the J6 Committee regarding General Flynn and/or QAnon;" iii. "All documents that show General Flynn promoted any 'QAnon slogan';" iv. "Any evidence that supports the contention that General Flynn is a QAnon follower;" v. "Any documents in Anderson Cooper's possession and control that mention any member of the Flynn family;" and vi. "CNN['s] tax returns and other support for its 'book value' estimate of net worth[.]" 3. To the extent CNN's pre-conference letters (ECF Nos. 94; 96) request the production of outstanding discovery, the Court orders as follows, as further set forth herein. 4. The parties shall produce the documents described in this Order, and any outstanding items from the Oct. 28 Order, by Thursday, December 15, 2022. 5. The parties shall order a transcript of the Conference and file it on the docket. The parties shall submit a single request to: etranscripts@nysd.uscourts.gov by Monday, November 28, 2022. 6. The Court will issue an order regarding the privilege log issued outlined in the Flynns' letter (ECF No. 80) and discussed in the October 28, 2022 conference (ECF min. entry Oct. 28, 2022; see ECF No. 92) in due course. 7. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, March 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m., on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. By 5:00 pm on Thursday, March 16, 2023, any party wishing to do so may file a letter of no longer than three (3) pages listing discovery disputes requiring the Court's attention. 8. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 95. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 11/23/2022) (vfr)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2022. Attorney Steven Biss appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys Katherine Bolger, Lindsey B. Cherner and Meenakshi Krishnan appeared on behalf of Defendant. (ne)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Fact Discovery due by 4/17/2023.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (vfr)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated November 22, 2022 re: #95 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated November 21, 2022. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated November 21, 2022. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn. Return Date set for 11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM..(Biss, Steven)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated November 21, 2022 re: Court's order (ECF No. #91 ). Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/28/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days... (nmo)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 10/28/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2023. (nmo)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: A telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for Wednesday, November 23, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/28/2022) (ate)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: In Person Discovery Hearing held on 10/28/2022. Attorney Steven Biss appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys Katherine Bolger and Deanna Shullman appeared on behalf of Defendant. (ne)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 24, 2022 re: Letter Outlining All Outstanding Discovery Disputes for October 28, 2022 Discovery Conference Per Court Order (ECF No. #84 ). Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #88 Letter filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's letter-motion seeking to convert the telephonic discovery conference scheduled for Friday, October 28, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. to an in-person conference (ECF No. 88) is GRANTED, and the discovery conference shall now take place in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery Hearing set for 10/28/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/13/2022) (tg)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 13, 2022 re: Consented-to Request to Convert Telephonic Discovery Conference to In-Person. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Letter Motion to Seal. Defendant's letter-motion seeking to seal the privilege log at ECF No. 86 (ECF No. 85) is GRANTED. The document at ECF No. 86 shall remain visible only to the selected parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 85. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/11/2022) (kv)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Filing Document Under Seal re: #85 LETTER MOTION to Seal the July 15, 2022 Privilege Log, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 11, 2022.. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc., John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #85 .(Bolger, Katherine)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 LETTER MOTION to Seal the July 15, 2022 Privilege Log, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 11, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #82 Letter filed by Cable News Network, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: By Monday, October 24, 2022, the parties shall file a single letter, no longer than five pages, outlining all outstanding discovery disputes to be discussed at the telephonic conference scheduled for Friday, October 28, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/7/2022) (tg)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 10/7/2022 re: #80 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 4, 2022. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 10/7/2022 Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #80 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 4, 2022. filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall be prepared to discuss the issues raised in Plaintiff's letter-motion seeking an order to compel (ECF No. 80), in addition to the topics outlined in ECF No. 78, at the telephonic conference scheduled for Friday, October 28, 2022 at 12:00 pm. By Thursday, October 13, 2022, the parties shall file the privilege log discussed in ECF No. 80. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/5/22) (yv)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 4, 2022. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn. Return Date set for 10/28/2022 at 12:00 PM..(Biss, Steven)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 4, 2022 re: #72 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 26, 2022. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #72 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; granting #77 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The telephonic conference scheduled for Thursday, October 27, 2022 at 11:00 am is ADJOURNED to Friday, October 28, 2022 at 12:00 pm (the "Conference"). At the Conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss (i) the discovery issues outlined in Defendants' letter motion dated September 26, 2022, (see ECF No. 72), (ii) Plaintiffs' response dated October 1, 2022, (see ECF No. 75), and (iii) the issues outlined in Defendant's letter-motion dated October 4, 2022. (ECF No. 77). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 77. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/4/2022) (kv)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Deanna K. Shullman dated October 4, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Shullman, Deanna)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #75 Letter Response with respect to #72 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. ENDORSEMENT: A telephonic discovery conference will be held on Thursday, October 27, 2022 at 11:00 am, on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the discovery issues outlined in Defendants' letter-motion (ECF No. 72) and Plaintiffs' response. (ECF No. 75). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/3/2022) (vfr) Modified on 10/3/2022 (vfr).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (vfr)
October 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 1, 2022 re: #72 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 26, 2022. . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: granting #73 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' letter-motion seeking an extension of time to request a settlement conference (ECF No. 73) is GRANTED, and the parties shall file a joint letter by Friday, October 7, 2022, advising the Court (i) whether the parties are interested in a settlement conference, and (ii) the status of discovery. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 73. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/28/2022) (ama)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 28, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 26, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 26, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine) Modified on 9/26/2022 (kj).
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Katherine Mary Bolger to RE-FILE Document #71 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated September 26, 2022.. Use the event type Other Filings- Other Documents found under the event list Letter. (kj)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #69 Letter filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' letter-motion seeking an extension of time to request a settlement conference (ECF No. 69) is GRANTED, and the parties shall file a joint letter by Monday, October 3, 2022, advising the Court (i) whether the parties are interested in a settlement conference, and (ii) the status of discovery. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 8/24/2022) (kgo)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from the Parties dated August 23, 2022 re: Joint Discovery Status Report. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties' letter-motion seeking an extension of time to file a status letter (ECF No. 66) is GRANTED. The parties shall file a status letter by Tuesday, August 23, 2022. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 66. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 8/16/22) (yv)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsey Blair Cherner on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc...(Cherner, Lindsey)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery Status Report (ECF No. #58 ) from August 16, 2022, to August 23, 2022, addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated August 15, 2022. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #49 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #42 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, . filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. For the reasons stated above, CNN's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and CNN's motion for certification under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is DENIED. On reconsideration, the Court voids the portion of Flynn I which held that the Flynns plausibly alleged that CNN was negligent for purposes of their defamation claim. Because the Court dismissed the Flynns' defamation claim on alternative grounds, granting CNN's motion to reconsider on this ground does not impact the Court's ultimate holding in Flynn I. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt No. 49. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/12/2022) (tg)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for Cable News Network, Inc.. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #62 Motion for Deanna K. Shullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Defendant Cable News Network vis-a-vis Deanna K. Shullman, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-styled suit is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-styled case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing the discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 62. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/24/22) (yv)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #62 SECOND MOTION for Deanna K. Shullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SECOND MOTION for Deanna K. Shullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Bolger, Katherine)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #61 MOTION for Deanna K. Shullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25864119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Deanna K. Shullman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25864119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Bolger, Katherine) Modified on 3/16/2022 (bcu).
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 59. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/15/2022) (mml)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 3/14/2022 re: (Proposed) Protective Order. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Blackline Comparison of (Proposed) Protective Order, #2 (Proposed) Protective Order).(Bolger, Katherine)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #57 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report filed by Cable News Network, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed Case Management Plan (ECF No. 57) is ADOPTED. The parties shall file a joint discovery status report by August 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/2/2022) (tg)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2022. Attorney Steven Biss appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorney Katherine Bolger appeared on behalf of Defendants. (ne)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Meenakshi Krishnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Meenakshi Krishnan for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the local rules of this court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 55. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 2/7/22) (yv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #55 MOTION for Meenakshi Krishnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25687756. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Meenakshi Krishnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25687756. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Krishnan, Meenakshi)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #49 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #42 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 will be held on Wednesday, March 2, 2022 at 2:00 pm, on the Court's conference line. The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). It is further ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than 21 days before the Initial Case Management Conference. No later than one week (seven (7) calendar days) before the conference, the parties shall file a Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Case Management Plan, via ECF, signed by counsel for each party. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-sarah-l-cave. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/18/22) (yv)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #49 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #42 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, . . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. The Court has received Defendant's motion for reconsideration, Dkt. No. 49. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by January 13, 2022. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by January 20, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #42 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #38 Report and Recommendations. (sjo)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #38 Report and Recommendations. (sjo)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #38 Report and Recommendations. (sjo)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #38 Report and Recommendations. (sjo)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 14, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the potion pending at Dkt. No. 43. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/21/2021) (rro)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine M. Bolger dated 12/21/2021. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Cable News Network, Inc. answer due 1/14/2022. (rro)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER for #17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cable News Network, Inc., #38 Report and Recommendations. For the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts Judge Cave's report and recommendation in part and rejects it in part. The Flynns' defamation claim against CNN is dismissed, but the Flynns' false light claim is adequately pleaded. Accordingly, CNN's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/16/2021) (rro)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DECLARATION of Katherine M. Bolger in Support re: #40 Response. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14).(Bolger, Katherine)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE re: #39 Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OBJECTION to #38 Report and Recommendations Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Cable News Network, Inc., #7 Amended Complaint filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. For the reasons set forth above, the Court respectfully recommends that CNN's Motion be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (1) CNN's Motion seeking dismissal of the defamation and false light claims should be GRANTED; and (2) CNN's request for fees, costs, and expenses should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/22/2021) (va)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 21, 2021 re: Summary Order in the 2nd Circuit. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summary Order)).(Bolger, Katherine)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Steven S. Biss, Counsel for Plaintiffs dated October 18, 2021 re: Additional Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated October 18, 2021 re: Oral Argument held on 10/14/2021: Additional Material. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Motion Hearing proceeding held on 10/14/2021 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days... (va)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2022. (va)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave: Oral Argument held on 10/14/2021 re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Attorney Steven Biss appeared on behalf of plaintiffs. Attorney Katherine Mary Bolger appeared on behalf of defendant. (ne)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #31 Motion for Sam F. Cate-Gumpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 31. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 8/6/2021) (js)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Sam F. Cate-Gumpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Sam F. Cate-Gumpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 (Proposed) Order).(Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #30 MOTION for Sam F. Cate-Gumpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24838005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sam F. Cate-Gumpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24838005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 (Proposed) Order).(Cate-Gumpert, Sam) Modified on 7/27/2021 (vba).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #28 Letter filed by Cable News Network, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold oral argument concerning Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 17) on Thursday, October 14, 2021, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Oral Argument set for 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/19/2021) (rro)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 7/19/2021 re: Oral Argument Date. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and advise the Court by Monday, July 19, 2021, which of the following dates they prefer for Oral Argument: (i) October 12, 2021, at 2:00 pm; (ii) October 13, 2021, at 10:00 am, 11:00 am, or 2:00 pm; (iii) October 14, 2021, at 10:00 am, 11:00 am, or 2:00 pm; (iv) October 21, 2021, at 11:00 am or 3:00 pm; or (v) October 22, 2021, at 11:00 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/14/21) (yv)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Zenilman's letter-motion requesting to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs (ECF No. 24) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Mr. Zenilman as counsel for Plaintiffs and to close ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Jeremy Zenilman terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 7/12/21) (yv)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST MOTION for jeremy zenilman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Supplement letter to judge).(Zenilman, Jeremy)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Biss, Steven)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony C. Carlini, Jr on behalf of Leslie A. Flynn..(Carlini, Anthony)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony C. Carlini, Jr on behalf of John P. "Jack" Flynn..(Carlini, Anthony)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 6/21/2021 re: Requesting Oral Argument. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Katherine M. Bolger in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14).(Bolger, Katherine)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 5/18/2021.. Defendant's letter-motion requesting an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED, and the deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is EXTENDED to Friday, June 18, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 15. SO-ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 5/18/2021) Cable News Network, Inc. answer due 6/18/2021 (ks)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Katherine M. Bolger dated 5/18/2021. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/13/2021) (kv)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 1, 2021, Dkt. No. 4, is adjourned. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Steven S. Biss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #8 MOTION for Steven S. Biss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24527567. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for Cable News Network, Inc.. Document filed by Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Mary Bolger on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc...(Bolger, Katherine)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Steven S. Biss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24527567. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order C - Proposed Order).(Zenilman, Jeremy)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Steven S. Biss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24527567. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Cable News Network, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John P. "Jack" Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Zenilman, Jeremy)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Cable News Network, Inc. served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McClaren. Document filed by Leslie A. Flynn..(Zenilman, Jeremy)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cable News Network, Inc...(dnh)
March 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/27/2021) (mro)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cable News Network, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leslie A. Flynn..(Zenilman, Jeremy)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zenilman, Jeremy)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremy Zenilman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Zenilman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cable News Network, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24308071)Document filed by John P. Flynn, Leslie A. Flynn..(Zenilman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn et al v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Flynn
Represented By: Jeremy Zenilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie A. Flynn
Represented By: Jeremy Zenilman
Represented By: Anthony C. Carlini, Jr.
Represented By: Steven S Biss
Represented By: Jared Joseph Roberts
Represented By: Jason Caldwell Greaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. "Jack" Flynn
Represented By: Jeremy Zenilman
Represented By: Anthony C. Carlini, Jr.
Represented By: Steven S Biss
Represented By: Jared Joseph Roberts
Represented By: Jason Caldwell Greaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Mary Bolger
Represented By: Sam Finn Cate-Gumpert
Represented By: Meenakshi Krishnan
Represented By: Lindsey Blair Cherner
Represented By: Deanna K Shullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?