Guira et al v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Umar Guira and Asseta Nanema
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02615
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Service was accepted by OSRICK GORDON CIVIL CLERK. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. United States Of America served on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Umar Guira ; Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Of America..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The May 14, 2021 IPTC is ADJOURNED to June 11, 2021, at 11:00a.m. The parties' joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan are due not later than June 3, 2021. Plaintiff's counsel is warned, however, that absent more compelling reasons, the Court is unlikely to grant any further adjournments. The Court's March 29, 2021 Order explicitly encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly and warns that "[r]equests for adjournment of the IPTC will not necessarily be granted on the ground that one or more Defendants have not been served or answered prior to the scheduled IPTC." Dkt. 7. Whereas Plaintiff requests an adjournment because Defendant has yet to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, the Court notes that, as of the date of this order, Plaintiff has not posted proof of service on the docket. To the extent Plaintiff has not yet served Defendant, Plaintiff should do so immediately. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/05/2021) (ama)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Randolph Janis dated May 5 2021. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on May 14, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888- 363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2615. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by May 6, 2021, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2021) (ama)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph) Modified on 3/26/2021 (dnh).
March 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randolph Daniel Janis to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party of record as to whom the summons is being issued must appear in the defendant 'To' section of the summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randolph Daniel Janis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ; Umar Guira ; Asseta Nanema. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
March 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randolph Daniel Janis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act. (dnh)
March 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph) Modified on 3/26/2021 (dnh).
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Janis, Randolph)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24309402)Document filed by Umar Guira, Asseta Nanema..(Janis, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guira et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umar Guira
Represented By: Randolph Daniel Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asseta Nanema
Represented By: Randolph Daniel Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?