Argonaut Insurance Company v. Rosen et al
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Defendant: Larry Blum, Matthew D. Rosen, Marvin Rosen, Michael Del Guidice, Lewis Dickey, William Rubin, Holcombe T. Green, III, John Rosen, Rafe De La Gueronniere, Holcombe T. Green, Jr., Philip D. Turtis, Paul O'Brien and Philip D. Turits
Case Number: 1:2021cv02690
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332ds
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #39 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Monica Asher dated 5/25/21. SO ORDERED. Holcombe T. Green, III answer due 7/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/26/2021) (vfr)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #38 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel S. Shamah dated May 25, 2021. SO ORDERED. Larry Blum answer due 7/1/2021; Michael Del Guidice answer due 7/1/2021; Paul O'Brien answer due 7/1/2021; John Rosen answer due 7/1/2021; Marvin Rosen answer due 7/1/2021; Matthew D. Rosen answer due 7/1/2021; William Rubin answer due 7/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/26/2021) (vfr)
May 25, 2021 Filing 39 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Monica Asher dated 5/25/21. Document filed by Holcombe T. Green, III..(Asher, Monica)
May 25, 2021 Filing 38 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel S. Shamah dated May 25, 2021. Document filed by Larry Blum, Michael Del Guidice, Paul O'Brien, John Rosen, Marvin Rosen, Matthew D. Rosen, William Rubin..(Shamah, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Evan W. Bolla dated 05/11/2021. SO ORDERED. Rafe De La Gueronniere answer due 7/1/2021; Lewis Dickey answer due 7/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/11/2021) (vfr)
May 11, 2021 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Evan W. Bolla dated 05/11/2021. Document filed by Rafe De La Gueronniere, Lewis Dickey..(Bolla, Evan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John P. Coffey dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Larry Blum, Paul O'Brien, John Rosen, William Rubin, Philip D. Turits. So ordered. Larry Blum answer due 5/31/2021; Paul O'Brien answer due 5/31/2021; John Rosen answer due 5/31/2021; William Rubin answer due 5/31/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/1/2021) (rjm)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel S. Shamah dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Michael Del Guidice, Marvin Rosen, Matthew D. Rosen. So ordered. Michael Del Guidice answer due 5/31/2021; Marvin Rosen answer due 5/31/2021; Matthew D. Rosen answer due 5/31/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/1/2021) (rjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 33 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John P. Coffey dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Larry Blum, Paul O'Brien, John Rosen, William Rubin, Philip D. Turits..(Coffey, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel S. Shamah dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Michael Del Guidice, Marvin Rosen, Matthew D. Rosen..(Shamah, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Monica Asher dated April 28, 2021., #3 Complaint,. SO ORDERED. Holcombe T. Green, III answer due 5/31/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/28/2021) (nb) Modified on 5/4/2021 (nb).
April 28, 2021 Filing 30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Monica Asher dated April 28, 2021. Document filed by Holcombe T. Green, III..(Asher, Monica)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 7/2/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/19/2021) (nb)
April 13, 2021 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Holcombe T. Green, III served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. Service was accepted by Mrs. Green(wife). Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 6, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rafe De La Gueronniere..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lewis Dickey..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holcombe T. Green, III..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holcombe T. Green, Jr..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul O'Brien..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Rubin..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Larry Blum..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Del Guidice..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Rosen..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philip D. Turits..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marvin Rosen..(dnh)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew D. Rosen..(dnh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rafe De La Gueronniere, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lewis Dickey, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holcombe T. Green, III, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holcombe T. Green, Jr., re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul O'Brien, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Rubin, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Larry Blum, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Del Guidice, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Rosen, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Philip D. Turits, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marvin Rosen, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew D. Rosen, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Kerstein, Erica)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Larry Blum, Rafe De La Gueronniere, Michael Del Guidice, Lewis Dickey, Holcombe T. Green, III, Holcombe T. Green, Jr, Paul O'Brien, John Rosen, Marvin Rosen, Matthew D. Rosen, William Rubin, Philip D. Turits. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint).(Kerstein, Erica)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kerstein, Erica)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Erica Joy Kerstein. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Erica Joy Kerstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; each party whom the pleading is against must be individually selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Erica Joy Kerstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Philip D. Turtis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
March 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24322427)Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Complaint, #2 Exhibit Policy).(Kerstein, Erica) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut Insurance Company v. Rosen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Blum
Represented By: John Patrick Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Rosen
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Del Guidice
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Dickey
Represented By: Evan Wilson Bolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rubin
Represented By: John Patrick Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holcombe T. Green, III
Represented By: Monica Susan Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rosen
Represented By: John Patrick Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafe De La Gueronniere
Represented By: Evan Wilson Bolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holcombe T. Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip D. Turtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul O'Brien
Represented By: John Patrick Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip D. Turits
Represented By: John Patrick Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Erica Joy Kerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?