United States of America v. $9,700,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $9,700,000 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2021cv02696
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Olga I Zverovich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $9,700,000 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Zverovich, Olga)
March 31, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Olga I Zverovich to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the pleading must be titled to correspond with the event type used (Complaint for Forfeiture). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint for Forfeiture found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/5/2021. (jgo)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zverovich, Olga)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $9,700,000 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Zverovich, Olga) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $9,700,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,700,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Olga I Zverovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?