SuperCom Ltd. v. Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: SuperCom Ltd.
Defendant: Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd. and Wedbush Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02857
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas J. Fleming dated May 26, 2021 re: Courts Initial Pretrial Conference Order dated May 17, 2021 [Dkt. No. 8]. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas J. Fleming dated May 26, 2021 re: Magistrate. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against SuperCom Ltd.. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Fleming, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against SuperCom Ltd.. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #4 Letter, filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd., #5 Letter filed by SuperCom Ltd.. Accordingly: 1. Defendant Sabby Volatility Wanant Master Fund Ltd.'s ("Sabby") request for leave to move to dismiss the complaint is GRANTED; 2. By June 22, 2021, Sabby shall file its motion to dismiss the complaint; 3. By July 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers; and 4. By July 27, 2021, Sabby shall file its reply papers, if any. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 6/22/2021., Responses due by 7/13/2021, Replies due by 7/27/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/18/2021) (kv)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2021) (kv)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:00 a.m., on June 2, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2021) (kv)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2021) (kv)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Stewart Katz on behalf of SuperCom Ltd...(Katz, Adam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from A Katz, Goldberg Segalla LLP dated 05/12/21 re: Response to Pre-Motion letter. Document filed by SuperCom Ltd...(Katz, Adam)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas J. Fleming dated April 30, 2021 re: pre-motion letter in support of dismissal. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Fleming, Thomas)
April 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas James Fleming. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1446;. (jgo)
April 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd...(Fleming, Thomas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fleming, Thomas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 652142/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24347259).Document filed by Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Fleming, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SuperCom Ltd. v. Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabby Volatility Warrant Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedbush Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SuperCom Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Stewart Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?