Moncion v. Flat Rate Movers Ltd
Plaintiff: Taneil Moncion
Defendant: Flat Rate Movers Ltd
Case Number: 1:2021cv02865
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/27/2021) (nb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Flat Rate Movers Ltd..(Travis, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Flat Rate Movers Ltd..(Travis, Christopher)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher Travis dated 4/27/2021. SO ORDERED. Flat Rate Movers Ltd answer due 5/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/28/2021) (mml)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher Travis dated 4/27/2021. Document filed by Flat Rate Movers Ltd..(Travis, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Robert Travis on behalf of Flat Rate Movers Ltd..(Travis, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Flat Rate Movers Ltd served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. Service was accepted by Alex Gesing, Legal & Compliance Associate. Document filed by Taneil Moncion..(Mazaheri, Bernard)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Flat Rate Movers Ltd..(jgo)
April 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bernard R Mazaheri. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Flat Rate Movers Ltd, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Taneil Moncion..(Mazaheri, Bernard)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mazaheri, Bernard)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flat Rate Movers Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24348237)Document filed by Taneil Moncion..(Mazaheri, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncion v. Flat Rate Movers Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Rate Movers Ltd
Represented By: Christopher Robert Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taneil Moncion
Represented By: Bernard R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?