Littman Krooks LLP v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Littman Krooks LLP, D.G. individually and on behalf of E.P., T.H. individually and on behalf of D.T., E.V. individually and on behalf of E.M., M.L. individually and on behalf of A.L., R.O. individually and on behalf of A.O., N.C. individually and on behalf of E.C., E.A. individually and on behalf of N.M., J.J. individually and on behalf of J.R., S.R. individually and on behalf of B.B., Y.M. individually and on behalf of P.O., A.D. individually and on behalf of M.P., F.K. individually and on behalf of J.K., Y.B. individually and on behalf of J.T., D.H. individually and on behalf of E.H., A.V. individually and on behalf of T.R.S., F.L.S. individually and on behalf of F.L., T.S. individually and on behalf of D.H., J.P. individually and on behalf of A.G., G.J. individually and on behalf of J.M., R.M. individually and on behalf of A.M.W., M.M. individually and on behalf of F.J.L., G.G. individually and on behalf of R.S., M.A. individually and on behalf of R.A., E.V. individually and on behalf of A.M., G.C. individually and on behalf of A.J., R.G. individually and on behalf of A.G., J.P. individually and on behalf of J.R. and T.M. individually and on behalf of M.C.
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Interested Party: Marion Walsh and Ingrid Castillo
Case Number: 1:2021cv02947
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #6 Letter Motion to Stay re: #6 LETTER MOTION to Stay , on consent, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mart Bowe dated 05/11/2021. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 11, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. Doc. 6. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/10/2021) (cf)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Stay , on consent, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Mart Bowe dated 05/11/2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
May 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York City Department of Education answer due 10/11/2021. (cf)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on New York City Department of Education on April 20, 2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(gp)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi)
April 7, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners R.M. individually and on behalf of A.M.W., F.K. individually and on behalf of J.K., T.S. individually and on behalf of D.H., F.L.S. individually and on behalf of F.L., N.C. individually and on behalf of E.C., Marion Walsh, G.G. individually and on behalf of R.S., E.V. individually and on behalf of E.M., M.M. individually and on behalf of F.J.L., G.C. individually and on behalf of A.J., E.V. individually and on behalf of A.M., A.V. individually and on behalf of T.R.S., Ingrid Castillo, S.R. individually and on behalf of B.B., J.P. individually and on behalf of A.G., M.A. individually and on behalf of R.A., Y.B. individually and on behalf of J.T., Y.M. individually and on behalf of P.O., R.O. individually and on behalf of A.O., M.L. individually and on behalf of A.L., T.M. individually and on behalf of M.C., G.J. individually and on behalf of J.M., A.D. individually and on behalf of M.P., E.A. individually and on behalf of N.M., T.H. individually and on behalf of D.T., D.H. individually and on behalf of E.H., J.J. individually and on behalf of J.R., J.P. individually and on behalf of J.R., D.G. individually and on behalf of E.P., R.G. individually and on behalf of A.G. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,.Document filed by R.M. individually and on behalf of A.M.W., F.K. individually and on behalf of J.K., T.S. individually and on behalf of D.H., F.L.S. individually and on behalf of F.L., N.C. individually and on behalf of E.C., Marion Walsh, G.G. individually and on behalf of R.S., E.V. individually and on behalf of E.M., M.M. individually and on behalf of F.J.L., G.C. individually and on behalf of A.J., E.V. individually and on behalf of A.M., A.V. individually and on behalf of T.R.S., Ingrid Castillo, S.R. individually and on behalf of B.B., J.P. individually and on behalf of A.G., M.A. individually and on behalf of R.A., Y.B. individually and on behalf of J.T., Y.M. individually and on behalf of P.O., R.O. individually and on behalf of A.O., M.L. individually and on behalf of A.L., T.M. individually and on behalf of M.C., G.J. individually and on behalf of J.M., A.D. individually and on behalf of M.P., E.A. individually and on behalf of N.M., T.H. individually and on behalf of D.T., D.H. individually and on behalf of E.H., J.J. individually and on behalf of J.R., J.P. individually and on behalf of J.R., D.G. individually and on behalf of E.P., R.G. individually and on behalf of A.G.. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,..(Pal, Arshi)
April 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
April 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Arshi Pal. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
April 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arshi Pal re: Document No. #1 Complaint,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (gp)
April 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Arshi Pal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (gp)
April 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
April 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR COMPLAINT against NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24360755)Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A RA 178599-Decision, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B NM 175514-Decision, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C EC 172560-Decision, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D AJ 185672-Decision, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E MP 181299-Decision, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F AG 174234-Decision, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G EP 185558-Decision, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H RS 191157-Decision, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I EH 183234-Decision, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J DT 190803-Decision, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K JM 175487-Decision, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L JR 189818-Decision, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M JK 192754-Decision, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N A.L 175831- Amended Decision, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O PO 179253-Decision, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P AMW 192267-Decision, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q FL185548-Corrected Decision, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R MC 190178-Decision, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S AO 182009-Decision, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T JR 185348-Decision, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U AG 166078- Decision, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V BB 178415- Decision, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W FL 190003-Decision, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X DH 171798-Decision, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Z EM 185546-Decision, #27 Exhibit Exhibit AA TS 192321-Decision, #28 Exhibit Exhibit BB JT 168813-Decision, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Y AM 185545-Decision).(Pal, Arshi) Modified on 4/7/2021 (gp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littman Krooks LLP v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Littman Krooks LLP
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.G. individually and on behalf of E.P.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.H. individually and on behalf of D.T.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.V. individually and on behalf of E.M.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.L. individually and on behalf of A.L.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.O. individually and on behalf of A.O.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C. individually and on behalf of E.C.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A. individually and on behalf of N.M.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J. individually and on behalf of J.R.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R. individually and on behalf of B.B.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.M. individually and on behalf of P.O.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D. individually and on behalf of M.P.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.K. individually and on behalf of J.K.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.B. individually and on behalf of J.T.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.H. individually and on behalf of E.H.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.V. individually and on behalf of T.R.S.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.L.S. individually and on behalf of F.L.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S. individually and on behalf of D.H.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. individually and on behalf of A.G.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.J. individually and on behalf of J.M.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M. individually and on behalf of A.M.W.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M. individually and on behalf of F.J.L.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.G. individually and on behalf of R.S.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A. individually and on behalf of R.A.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.V. individually and on behalf of A.M.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C. individually and on behalf of A.J.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G. individually and on behalf of A.G.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. individually and on behalf of J.R.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.M. individually and on behalf of M.C.
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marion Walsh
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ingrid Castillo
Represented By: Arshi Pal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?