Rasul v. R/GA Media Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Sumeera Rasul
Defendant: R/GA MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE INTERPUBLIC GROUP OF COMPANIES, INC., ERIN LYNCH and Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02999
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.(in their individual capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.(In Its Professional Capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Erin Lynch(in their individual capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; Erin Lynch(In Her Professional Capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; R/GA Media Group, Inc.(in their individual capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021; R/GA Media Group, Inc. (In Its Professional Capacity) waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. Document filed by Sumeera Rasul..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc...(dnh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R/GA Media Group, Inc...(dnh)
April 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., Erin Lynch, R/GA Media Group, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Sumeera Rasul. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 8, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents R/GA Media Group, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., Erin Lynch added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Sumeera Rasul. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Solomon Predovan to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong party is listed in the defendant 'To:' section of the summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Solomon Predovan re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties R/GA Media Group, Inc.; Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.; Erin Lynch a second time with party text 'in their professional capacity.' Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh) Modified on 4/8/2021 (dnh).
April 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Solomon Predovan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ERIN LYNCH, R/GA MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE INTERPUBLIC GROUP OF COMPANIES, INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rebecca Solomon Predovan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451 Employment Discrimination. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981 Civil Rights. (dnh)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIN LYNCH, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sumeera Rasul..(Predovan, Rebecca) Modified on 4/8/2021 (dnh).
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE INTERPUBLIC GROUP OF COMPANIES, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sumeera Rasul..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R/GA MEDIA GROUP, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sumeera Rasul..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Predovan, Rebecca)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIN LYNCH, R/GA MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE INTERPUBLIC GROUP OF COMPANIES, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24366611)Document filed by Sumeera Rasul..(Predovan, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasul v. R/GA Media Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/GA MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE INTERPUBLIC GROUP OF COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumeera Rasul
Represented By: Rebecca Solomon Predovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?