Amorosa et al v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp. and Dominic F. Amorosa
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY and Jeffrey S. Bornstein
Case Number: 1:2021cv03137
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Colleen C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
June 11, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Colleen C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24659725. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Colleen C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24659725. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Bornstein, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Smith, Colleen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Blake T. Denton, Dominic F. Amorosa, and Richard A. Russo dated May 7, 2021 re: the Court's April 16, 2021 Order. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Bornstein, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY..(Denton, Blake)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blake Thomas Denton on behalf of Jeffrey S. Bornstein, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY..(Denton, Blake)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeffrey S. Bornstein waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Document filed by Dominic F. Amorosa; Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp..(Amorosa, Dominic)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Document filed by Dominic F. Amorosa; Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp..(Amorosa, Dominic)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominic F. Amorosa on behalf of Dominic F. Amorosa, Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp..(Amorosa, Dominic)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with ECF privileges and to close ECF No. 3. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/16/2021) (cf)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In the interests of judicial economy, the parties in both cases are directed to confer with one another and, no later than May 7, 2021, to submit a joint letter addressing the parties positions on how the Court should proceed with the new case, including whether the cases should be consolidated, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 42; how the rulings on any pending motions in No. 17-CV-8457 might apply to the claims in No. 21-CV-3137; whether there is a need for a conference to discuss any of the foregoing (or anything else); and anything else the parties think appropriately bears on the Court's management of the cases going forward. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/16/2021) (cf)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Dominic F. Amorosa to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Dominic F. Amorosa.(sc)
April 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
April 15, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-08457-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
April 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-8457. Document filed by Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp..(rdz)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey S. Bornstein, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Filing Fee $ $402.00, Receipt Number 465401277537)Document filed by Dominic F. Amorosa, Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp. (Attachments: #1 Receipt).(rdz)
April 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
April 12, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey S. Bornstein, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY..(rdz)
April 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amorosa et al v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic F. Amorosa, Esp.
Represented By: Dominic F. Amorosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic F. Amorosa
Represented By: Dominic F. Amorosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Blake Thomas Denton
Represented By: Colleen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Bornstein
Represented By: Blake Thomas Denton
Represented By: Colleen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?