K.S. v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: K.S.
Defendant: Chancellor of DOE Meisha Porter, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter
Case Number: 1:2021cv03274
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Nimmer on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Martha Nimmer dated 05/10/21.. Granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/12/2021) (ks)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Martha Nimmer dated 05/10/21. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Mart Bowe dated 05/04/2021 re: #1 Complaint. Granted. Defendant's time to answer or to otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to July 6, 2021. New York City Department of Education answer due 7/6/2021; Meisha Porter answer due 7/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/6/2021) (va)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Mart Bowe dated 05/04/2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Bowe, Martin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Meisha Porter served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck - Clerk Authorized to Accept. Document filed by K.S...(Cooperman, Kerry)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Department of Education served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck - Clerk Authorized to Accept. Document filed by K.S...(Cooperman, Kerry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meisha Porter..(dnh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(dnh)
April 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Meisha Porter, as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by K.S...(Cooperman, Kerry)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by K.S...(Cooperman, Kerry)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cooperman, Kerry)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24400132)Document filed by K.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Hearing Officer Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Interim Hearing Officer Decisions, #3 Exhibit C - Attorneys Fee Invoice).(Cooperman, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.S. v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor of DOE Meisha Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Represented By: Martha Nimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meisha Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.S.
Represented By: Kerry Tyler Cooperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?