King v. Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Jody King
Defendant: Joseph Pancari, Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., d/b/a Constructive Partnerships Unlimited, Elvart Dikiy, James Levy and Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc. doing business as Constructive Partnerships Unlimited
Case Number: 1:2021cv03327
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, August 6, 2021 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/14/2021) (rjm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc. waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021; Elvart Dikiy waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021; James Levy waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021; Joseph Pancari waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Pancari..(dnh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elvart Dikiy..(dnh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Levy..(dnh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc...(dnh)
April 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jonathan Shalom to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
April 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Shalom. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., d/b/a Constructive Partnerships Unlimited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG FORM - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shalom, Jonathan) Modified on 4/16/2021 (dnh).
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Pancari, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elvart Dikiy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Levy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CEREBAL PALSY ASSOCIATIONS OF NEW YORK STATE, INC. D/B/A CONSTRUCTIVE PARTNERSHIPS UNLIMITED, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., d/b/a Constructive Partnerships Unlimited, Elvart Dikiy, James Levy, Joseph Pancari. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24406704)Document filed by Jody King..(Shalom, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pancari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc., d/b/a Constructive Partnerships Unlimited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvart Dikiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerebral Palsy Associations of New York State, Inc. doing business as Constructive Partnerships Unlimited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody King
Represented By: Jonathan Shalom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?