Etten v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Etten
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Hachette Book Group, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Random House LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03341
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 sc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/25/21) (yv) Modified on 5/26/2021 (yv).
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Amazon.Com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Robert Etten. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Linkh, Gregory)
April 20, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
April 20, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
April 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penguin Random House LLC..(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hachette Book Group..(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon & Schuster, Inc...(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com, Inc...(dnh)
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Etten. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
April 19, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. (dnh)
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
April 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
April 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-00351. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harpercollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24408854)Document filed by Robert Etten..(Linkh, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etten v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Random House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Etten
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?