W.A. et al v. New York City Department of
Plaintiff: W.A. and S.A.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education and New York City Department of
Case Number: 1:2021cv03377
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam Dayan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam Dayan to RE-FILE re: Document No. #5 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by S.A.(on behalf of T.A.), S.A.(individually), W.A.(individually), W.A.(on behalf of T.A.)..(Dayan, Adam)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against New York City Department of.Document filed by W.A.(individually), S.A.(on behalf of T.A.), S.A.(individually), W.A.(on behalf of T.A.). Related document: #1 Complaint..(Dayan, Adam) Modified on 4/22/2021 (pc).
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam Dayan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the summons does not exactly match the party name on the Complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
April 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam Dayan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dayan, Adam)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by S.A.(on behalf of T.A.), S.A.(individually), W.A.(individually), W.A.(on behalf of T.A.)..(Dayan, Adam)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.A.(on behalf of T.A.), S.A.(individually), W.A.(individually), W.A.(on behalf of T.A.)..(Dayan, Adam) Modified on 4/19/2021 (pc).
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24412573)Document filed by W.A.(individually), S.A.(on behalf of T.A.), S.A.(individually), W.A.(on behalf of T.A.)..(Dayan, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.A. et al v. New York City Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.A.
Represented By: Adam Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Adam Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?