N. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: F. N.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv03379
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY JULY 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (nl)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Martha Nimmer dated 04/26/21. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Nimmer on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc)
April 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mendillo, Kevin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by F. N.(individually), F. N.(on behalf of I.N., a child with a disability )..(Mendillo, Kevin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24412695)Document filed by F. N.(individually), F. N.(on behalf of I.N., a child with a disability )..(Mendillo, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Martha Nimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. N.
Represented By: Kevin Mendillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?