Smart et al v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Gretha Smart and Justin Lopez
Defendant: Joy Headley, City of New York, Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Phoebus Widjaja, Iyeisha Witherspoon, Jayne Nwankwo and Anne Idowu
Case Number: 1:2021cv03420
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 dp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, on Consent addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brian Krist dated May 12, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/13/2021) (mml)
May 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joy Headley answer due 6/28/2021; Anne Idowu answer due 6/28/2021; City of New York answer due 6/28/2021; Jayne Nwankwo answer due 6/28/2021; Sharice Scott answer due 6/28/2021; Sharon St. Hill answer due 6/28/2021; Phoebus Widjaja answer due 6/28/2021; Iyeisha Witherspoon answer due 6/28/2021. (mml)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, on Consent addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brian Krist dated May 12, 2021. Document filed by Joy Headley, Anne Idowu, City of New York, Jayne Nwankwo, Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Phoebus Widjaja, Iyeisha Witherspoon..(Krist, Brian)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joy Headley, Anne Idowu, City of New York, Jayne Nwankwo, Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Phoebus Widjaja, Iyeisha Witherspoon..(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Joy Headley, Phoebus Widjaja, Anne Idowu, Jayne Nwankwo, Iyeisha Witherspoon, City of New York, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of her infant child HC), Gretha Smart(on behalf of her child CC), Gretha Smart(individually)..(Kubitschek, Carolyn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A Lebowitz on behalf of Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of her infant child HC), Gretha Smart(on behalf of her child CC), Gretha Smart(individually)..(Lebowitz, David)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kubitschek, Carolyn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Joy Headley, Anne Idowu, City of New York, Jayne Nwankwo, Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Phoebus Widjaja, Iyeisha Witherspoon. Document filed by Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of CC and HC), Gretha Smart(individually)..(Kubitschek, Carolyn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Joy Headley, Anne Idowu, City of New York, Jayne Nwankwo, Sharice Scott, Sharon St. Hill, Phoebus Widjaja, Iyeisha Witherspoon. Document filed by Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of CC and HC)..(Kubitschek, Carolyn) Modified on 4/20/2021 (dnh).
April 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carolyn A. Kubitschek. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gretha Smart. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Carolyn A. Kubitschek to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint, #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; all of filer/filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carolyn A. Kubitschek. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Kings. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of her child CC), Gretha Smart(individually), Gretha Smart(on behalf of her infant child HC) added. Party added pursuant to #3 Complaint,.Document filed by Justin Lopez, Gretha Smart(on behalf of her child CC), Gretha Smart(individually), Gretha Smart(on behalf of her infant child HC). Related document: #3 Complaint,..(Kubitschek, Carolyn)
April 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24418742)Document filed by Gretha Smart(individually)..(Kubitschek, Carolyn) Modified on 4/20/2021 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart et al v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Headley
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharice Scott
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon St. Hill
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoebus Widjaja
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iyeisha Witherspoon
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayne Nwankwo
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Idowu
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretha Smart
Represented By: Carolyn A. Kubitschek
Represented By: David A Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lopez
Represented By: Carolyn A. Kubitschek
Represented By: David A Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?