Associated Newspapers Ltd. et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mail Media, Inc. and Associated Newspapers Ltd.
Defendant: Google LLC and Alphabet Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03446
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated April 29, 2021. Time to answer or move extended to July 12, 2021. Initial conference adjourned from June 14, to July 28, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. The Court declines plaintiffs' request to Order the production of certain documents at this time. Letter motion (Doc 13) is terminated. SO ORDERED. Alphabet Inc. answer due 7/12/2021; Google LLC answer due 7/12/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/05/2021) (ama)
May 5, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (ama)
May 4, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated 05/04/2021 re: respectfully responding to Defendants' letter of May 3, 2021, ECF 17. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated May 3, 2021 re: respectfully responding to Plaintiff's letter of April 30, 2020, ECF 16. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated 04/30/2021 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated April 29, 2021. . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit B 9/9/2019 CID, #3 Exhibit C 6/22/2020 CID, #4 Exhibit D 3/18/2021 Transcript Excerpt).(Thorne, John)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion for John Thorne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S Sommer on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sommer, Michael)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated April 29, 2021. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for John Thorne to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24422236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Google LLC served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. Service was accepted by LYNANNE GARES (MANAGING AGENT). Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd.; Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alphabet Inc. served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. Service was accepted by LYNANNE GARES (MANAGING AGENT). Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd.; Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, June 14, 2021 at 12:30 p.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/22/2021) (ama)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC..(dnh)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alphabet Inc...(dnh)
April 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for John Thorne to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24422236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Thorne, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit IL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Thorne, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alphabet Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Daily Mail and General Trust plc for Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Thorne, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24421954)Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Newspapers Ltd. et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mail Media, Inc.
Represented By: John Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Newspapers Ltd.
Represented By: John Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Michael S Sommer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Sommer
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?