Azueta et al v. D and A Coffee LLC et al
Plaintiff: Telesforo Reyes and Constancio Azueta
Defendant: D and A Coffee LLC, Ronen Grady and D and A Coffee LLC jointly and severally doing business as 12 Chairs Caf
Case Number: 1:2021cv03523
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ronen Grady waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021; D and A Coffee LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. Document filed by Ronen Grady; D and A Coffee LLC..(Filindarakis, Maria)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria Filindarakis on behalf of D and A Coffee LLC, Ronen Grady..(Filindarakis, Maria)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andreas Koutsoudakis on behalf of D and A Coffee LLC, Ronen Grady..(Koutsoudakis, Andreas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronen Grady..(dnh)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to D and A Coffee LLC..(dnh)
April 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code pend (IFP pending). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
April 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: D and A Coffee LLC, Ronen Grady. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronen Grady, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Constancio Azueta, Telesforo Reyes..(Stillman, Lina)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to D and A Coffee LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Constancio Azueta, Telesforo Reyes..(Stillman, Lina)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D and A Coffee LLC, Ronen Grady. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24429986)Document filed by Constancio Azueta, Telesforo Reyes..(Stillman, Lina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azueta et al v. D and A Coffee LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D and A Coffee LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronen Grady
Represented By: Maria Filindarakis
Represented By: Andreas Koutsoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D and A Coffee LLC jointly and severally doing business as 12 Chairs Caf
Represented By: Maria Filindarakis
Represented By: Andreas Koutsoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telesforo Reyes
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constancio Azueta
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?