United States of America v. The Tanker Vessel Known As The "Courageous," Bearing International Maritime Organization Number 8617524
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Tanker Vessel Known As The "Courageous," Bearing International Maritime Organization Number 8617524
Case Number: 1:2021cv03636
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The time to file a joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan is ADJOURNED to July 29, 2021. The June 11, 2021 IPTC is ADJOURNED to August 6, 2021. If no party has appeared to contest the forfeiture or assert an interest in the defendant property by the July 12, 2021 deadline, the Government must move for a default judgment in accordance with this Court's Individual Practices not later than July 29, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 7/29/2021.). (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/8/2021) (kv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Kimberly Ravener / David W. Denton, Jr. dated June 7, 2021., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Kimberly Ravener / David W. Denton, Jr. dated June 7, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Ravener, Kimberly)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 11, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888- 363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 3288. Initial Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/29/2021) (nb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Denton, Jr on behalf of United States of America..(Denton, David)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge John P. Cronan is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
April 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ravener, Kimberly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against The Tanker Vessel Known As The "Courageous," Bearing International Maritime Organization Number 8617524.Document filed by United States of America..(Ravener, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Tanker Vessel Known As The "Courageous," Bearing International Maritime Organization Number 8617524
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tanker Vessel Known As The "Courageous," Bearing International Maritime Organization Number 8617524
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly Jane Ravener
Represented By: David William Denton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?