Monserrate v. Board of Elections in the City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Hiram Monserrate
Defendant: Commissioners of the Board of Elections in the City of New York, Board of Election in the City of New York, City of New York, New York City Campaign Finance Board and Board of Elections in the City of New York
Intervenor: Shabazz Plaintiffs
Case Number: 1:2021cv03830
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on July 6, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Initial Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/2/2021) (mml)
May 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Telephone Conference held on 5/4/2021 in re: (dkt. #1) Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Rocco Avallone present by telephone for Plaintiff. Stephen Kitzinger present by telephone for Defendants. Remy Green present by telephone for Intervenor. Court reporter present by telephone. The Court heard argument from Plaintiff and Defendants in regard to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The Court ruled that plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order is denied. (mf)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 INTERIM MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Order To Show Cause. . Document filed by Board of Elections in the City of New York, City of New York, Commissioners of the Board of Elections in the City of New York, New York City Campaign Finance Board..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Board of Elections in the City of New York, City of New York, Commissioners of the Board of Elections in the City of New York, New York City Campaign Finance Board..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #6 Order,,,,, Set Hearings,,,, seeking permission to appear on the record at the scheduled conference. addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Remy Green dated 2021-05-04. Document filed by Shabazz Plaintiffs..(Green, Remy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order of Judge Lewis J. Liman; Affirmation of Hiram Monserrate; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Plaintiff's Mome of Law in Support of TRO; and Statement of Relatedness served on Board of Elections in the City of New York, Commissioners of the City of New York, New York City Campaign Finance Board and City of New York on 05/03/2021. Service was made by email per Order. Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
May 3, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 05:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order on Tuesday, May 4, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. by TELEPHONE CONFERNECE. At that date and time the parties are directed to dial the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 (access code: 2123101). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the service of this Order, together with a copy all papers filed in this action by Plaintiff, shall be served on Defendants by email to:"servicenyboe2021@boe.nyc" and and ServiceECF@law.nyc.gov" on or before May 3, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs counsel must retain and file the auto-reply confirmation email that will be sent upon receipt by the Defendants as an exhibit to the proof of service; and such shall be deemed sufficient service of the instant action and motion. This order was issued on May 2, 2021 but will be posted on ECF on May 3, 2021. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 05:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/2/2021) (js)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-03069 (LJL). Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 21cv3069. (pc)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Rocco G Avallone, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rocco G Avallone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rocco G Avallone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Board of Election in the City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
April 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
April 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
April 30, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-03069-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Order To Show Cause. . Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Board of Election in the City of New York, City of New York, Commissioners of the Board of Elections in the City of New York, New York City Campaign Finance Board. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24473719)Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Order To Show Cause. Document filed by Hiram Monserrate. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Hiram Monserrate).(Avallone, Rocco) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monserrate v. Board of Elections in the City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioners of the Board of Elections in the City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Election in the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Campaign Finance Board
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Elections in the City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram Monserrate
Represented By: Rocco G Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Shabazz Plaintiffs
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?