Layne v. Capra
Petitioner: Malik Layne
Respondent: Michael Capra
Case Number: 1:2021cv03989
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Bernard Lyons on behalf of Michael Capra..(Lyons, Paul)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2254 Having determined that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 (Dkt. No. 1) should not be summarily dismissed, the Court hereby orders that: The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order to Answer and the Petition on the Attorney General of the State of New York and on the District Attorney of New York County by electronic means through the use of the court's CM/ECF system. Within sixty days of the date of this order, Respondent must file and serve (1) an answer, motion, or other response to the petition, and (2) the transcripts and briefs identified in Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file and serve any reply papers within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondents answer. Michael Capra answer due on 7/12/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/12/2021) (cf) . Modified on 5/13/2021 (cf).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/5/2021) (nb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madeline Byrd on behalf of Malik Layne..(Byrd, Madeline)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Steinerman on behalf of Malik Layne..(Steinerman, Sharon)
May 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McArdle, Christopher)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, . Document filed by Malik Layne..(McArdle, Christopher)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: New York. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24493823)Document filed by Malik Layne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit C-1, #9 Pre-Trial Transcript, #10 Trial Transcript, #11 Sentencing Transcript I, #12 Sentencing Transcript II).(McArdle, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layne v. Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malik Layne
Represented By: Christopher Louis McArdle
Represented By: Madeline Byrd
Represented By: Sharon Steinerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Capra
Represented By: NEW YORK COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE-GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: Paul Bernard Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?