AML IP, LLC v. Tencent America LLC
Plaintiff: AML IP, LLC
Defendant: Tencent America LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv04090
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/2/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Tencent America LLC. Document filed by AML IP, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Hoffman, David)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Tencent America LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by AML IP, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Hoffman, David) Modified on 6/2/2021 (km).
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney David Hoffman regarding Document No. #10 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents, or you can rename the document to a notice of voluntary dismissal and file it under Other Filings, Notices, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (km)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Tencent America LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. Service was accepted by Christopher Gonzales. Document filed by AML IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tencent America LLC..(pc)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tencent America LLC, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by AML IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Tencent America LLC. Document filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US7177838).(Hoffman, David)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
May 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
May 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David John Hoffman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing Attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of David Hoffman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-04090. Document filed by AML IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against AML IP, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24505555)Document filed by AML IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US7177838).(Hoffman, David) Modified on 5/7/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AML IP, LLC v. Tencent America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AML IP, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tencent America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?