Sollis v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sollis
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company,, AstraZeneca AB, Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astra USA Inc., Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca PLC, Astra USA Holdings Corporation, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, KBI Sub Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Zeneca Inc. and Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04198
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:21-cv-11756, filed on 05/26/2021. (sjo)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/25/2021) (sjo)
May 25, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey (sjo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astra USA Holdings Corporation, Astra USA Inc., AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, KBI Sub Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc., Zeneca Inc.(vf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP, Astra USA Inc, Zeneca Inc., KBI Sub Inc., Astra USA Holdings Corporation, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Procter & Gamble Company, Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc., Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jonathan Sollis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expanded Caption, #2 Exhibit Defendant Information).(Belkin, Kenneth)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants, Addresses and Counties).(Belkin, Kenneth)
May 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Evan Belkin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Court name is not on the PDF; the attorney information was omitted; Exhibit A is not necessary, but if including it, the Court name was omitted on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Evan Belkin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Evan Belkin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $100,000,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 367 (Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharma. Personal Injury Product Liability); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP, Astra USA Inc, Zeneca Inc., KBI Sub Inc., Astra USA Holdings Corporation, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Procter & Gamble Company, Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc., Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jonathan Sollis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expanded Caption, #2 Exhibit Defendant Information).(Belkin, Kenneth) Modified on 5/12/2021 (jgo).
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants, Addresses and Counties).(Belkin, Kenneth) Modified on 5/12/2021 (jgo).
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Astra USA Holdings Corporation, Astra USA Inc., AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, KBI Sub Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc., The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company,, Zeneca Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24523386)Document filed by Jonathan Sollis..(Belkin, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sollis v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra USA Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBI Sub Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sollis
Represented By: Kenneth Evan Belkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?