ChromaDex, Inc. et al v. Thorne Research, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of Dartmouth College and ChromaDex, Inc.
Defendant: Thorne Research, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04241
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY: This action, including all deadlines, is stayed pending the institution decision of the IPR proceeding involving the 807 patent; as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/9/2021) (cf)
July 9, 2021 Case Stayed (cf)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Thorne Research, Inc...(Sommer, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College. Document filed by Thorne Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Sommer, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Thorne HealthTech, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsui & Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Kirin Holdings Company, Limited for Thorne Research, Inc.. Document filed by Thorne Research, Inc...(Sommer, Michael)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Yiye Fu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Christopher N. Sipes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for R. Jason Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Yiye Fu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24702537. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fu, Yiye)
June 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Yiye Fu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24702537. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael S. Sommer dated June 1, 2021. Defendant's request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint to July 6, 2021, is granted. Thorne Research, Inc. answer due 7/6/2021 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/1/2021) (cf)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael S. Sommer dated June 1, 2021. Document filed by Thorne Research, Inc...(Sommer, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S Sommer on behalf of Thorne Research, Inc...(Sommer, Michael)
June 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Christopher N. Sipes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24606262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for R. Jason Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24606220. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Christopher N. Sipes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24606262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Sipes, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sipes, Christopher)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for R. Jason Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24606220. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fowler, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Thorne Research, Inc. served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc.; Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certified Mail Receipts).(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thorne Research, Inc.. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Diane Cieluch re: Document No. #2 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thorne Research, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College..(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trustees of Dartmouth College..(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ChromaDex Corporation for ChromaDex, Inc.. Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc...(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Cieluch, Jennifer)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thorne Research, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24528769)Document filed by ChromaDex, Inc., Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: U.S. Patent No. 8,197,807, #2 Exhibit B: U.S. Patent No. 8,383,086).(Cieluch, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ChromaDex, Inc. et al v. Thorne Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorne Research, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Dartmouth College
Represented By: Jennifer Diane Cieluch
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Yiye Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ChromaDex, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Diane Cieluch
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Yiye Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?