Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. Bizodo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Defendant: Bizodo, Inc. d/b/a SeamlessDocs and Bizodo, Inc. doing business as SeamlessDocs
Case Number: 1:2021cv04303
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint ., #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay Johnson dated 7/2/2021., #1 Complaint.Bizodo, Inc. answer due 8/6/2021; granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint ., #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay Johnson dated 7/2/2021.. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions. (Dkt. Nos. 11, 12). Bizodo, Inc. answer due 8/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/6/2021) (nb)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jay Johnson dated 7/2/2021. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Bizodo, Inc. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. Service was accepted by Robin Huttbanks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/17/2021) (ks)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
May 17, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bizodo, Inc...(jgo)
May 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bizodo, Inc. d/b/a SeamlessDocs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so redesignated. (wb)
May 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document No. #5 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the incorrect date was entered on the Date Filed field.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 5/14/2021 (jgo).
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bizodo, Inc. d/b/a SeamlessDocs, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bizodo, Inc. d/b/a SeamlessDocs. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24533527)Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. Bizodo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizodo, Inc. d/b/a SeamlessDocs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizodo, Inc. doing business as SeamlessDocs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?