Langlois v. Grubhub Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Langlois
Defendant: David Fisher, Brian McAndrews, Keith Richman, Katrina Lake, David Habiger, Matthew Maloney, Lloyd Frink, Girish Lakshman, Grubhub Inc. and Linda Johnson Rice
Case Number: 1:2021cv04369
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) David Fisher, Lloyd Frink, Grubhub Inc., David Habiger, Katrina Lake, Girish Lakshman, Matthew Maloney, Brian McAndrews, Linda Johnson Rice, Keith Richman. Document filed by Gary Langlois. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 25, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-03756-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madelyn Morris on behalf of David Fisher, Lloyd Frink, Grubhub Inc., David Habiger, Katrina Lake, Girish Lakshman, Matthew Maloney, Brian McAndrews, Linda Johnson Rice, Keith Richman..(Morris, Madelyn)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stefan H. Atkinson on behalf of David Fisher, Lloyd Frink, Grubhub Inc., David Habiger, Katrina Lake, Girish Lakshman, Matthew Maloney, Brian McAndrews, Linda Johnson Rice, Keith Richman..(Atkinson, Stefan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Matthew Maloney waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lloyd Frink waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Linda Johnson Rice waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Keith Richman waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Katrina Lake waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Grubhub Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Girish Lakshman waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Habiger waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Fisher waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brian McAndrews waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
May 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 1:21-cv-03756. (vf)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-03756. Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Monteverde, Juan)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Fisher, Lloyd Frink, Grubhub Inc., David Habiger, Katrina Lake, Girish Lakshman, Matthew Maloney, Brian McAndrews, Linda Johnson Rice, Keith Richman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24542246)Document filed by Gary Langlois..(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langlois v. Grubhub Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fisher
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McAndrews
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Richman
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Lake
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Habiger
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Maloney
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Frink
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girish Lakshman
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grubhub Inc.
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Johnson Rice
Represented By: Madelyn Morris
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Langlois
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?