Plymouth County Retirement Association v. Array Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement Association
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jim Fusaro, ATI Investment Parent, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Troy Alstead, Barclays Capital Inc., Jason Lee, Ron P. Corio, Cowen and Company, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Array Technologies, Inc., Guggenheim Securities, LLC, Frank Cannova, ATI Intermediate Holdings, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Nipul Patel, Piper Sandler & Co., Orlando D. Ashford, UBS Securities LLC, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV (Parallel), L.P., Brad Forth, Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C., Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Oaktree ATI Investors, L.P., Nomura Securities International, Inc. and Peter Jonna
Consolidated Plaintiff: Julian Keippel
Case Number: 1:2021cv04390
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to consolidate these actions for all pretrial purposes; and it is further ORDERED that all filings in connection with the consolidated action be docketed against the lower numbered case, 21 Civ. 4390; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close the referenced higher numbered case, 21 Civ. 5658, as a separate action and remove it from the Court's docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/6/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-04390-VM, 1:21-cv-05658-VM (rj)
May 17, 2021 Filing 60 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UBS Securities LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Troy Alstead..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 58 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roth Capital Partners, LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 57 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ron P. Corio..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Piper Sandler & Co...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Jonna..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 54 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orlando D. Ashford..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oppenheimer & Co. Inc...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV, L.P...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV (Parallel), L.P...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oaktree ATI Investors, L.P...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nomura Securities International, Inc...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nipul Patel..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MUFG Securities Americas Inc...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jim Fusaro..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Lee..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guggenheim Securities, LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frank Cannova..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cowen and Company, LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brad Forth..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclays Capital Inc...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATI Investment Parent, LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATI Intermediate Holdings, LLC..(gp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Array Technologies, Inc...(gp)
May 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
May 14, 2021 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Troy Alstead, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roth Capital Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ron P. Corio, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Piper Sandler & Co., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter Jonna, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orlando D. Ashford, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV (Parallel), L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oaktree ATI Investors, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nomura Securities International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nipul Patel, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MUFG Securities Americas Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jim Fusaro, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Lee, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guggenheim Securities, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs & Co., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frank Cannova, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cowen and Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brad Forth, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barclays Capital Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATI Investment Parent, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATI Intermediate Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Array Technologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McConville, Francis)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATI Intermediate Holdings, LLC, ATI Investment Parent, LLC, Troy Alstead, Array Technologies, Inc., Orlando D. Ashford, Barclays Capital Inc., Frank Cannova, Ron P. Corio, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Brad Forth, Jim Fusaro, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Guggenheim Securities, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C., Peter Jonna, Jason Lee, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Oaktree ATI Investors, L.P., Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Nipul Patel, Piper Sandler & Co., Roth Capital Partners, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24544822)Document filed by Plymouth County Retirement Association..(McConville, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plymouth County Retirement Association v. Array Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Fusaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATI Investment Parent, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Alstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron P. Corio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Array Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guggenheim Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cannova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATI Intermediate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nipul Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Sandler & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando D. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Securities Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Capital Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV (Parallel), L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Forth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Rice & Company L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaktree Power Opportunities Fund IV, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaktree ATI Investors, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Jonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement Association
Represented By: Francis Paul McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Julian Keippel
Represented By: James Michael LoPiano
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?