Seliger v. Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Seliger
Defendant: Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04414
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc. (vf)
May 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Patrick McCulloch on behalf of Mark Seliger..(McCulloch, Kevin)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24548816)Document filed by Mark Seliger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Photograph, #2 Exhibit 2 - Screen Capture).(Kleinman, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seliger v. Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jay Lane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Seliger
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?