Kapasi v. Credit Management, LP et al
Plaintiff: Anand Kapasi
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Credit Management, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv04471
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Jarret Wolf on behalf of Anand Kapasi..(Wolf, Benjamin)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Benjamin J. Wolf, Esq. dated July 14, 2021 re: Joint Letter Pursuant to Order and Notice of Initial Conference [ECF No. 10]. Document filed by Anand Kapasi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Wolf, Benjamin)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by July 16, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/2/2021) (kv)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The CMI Group Limited Partner, LLC, Corporate Parent The CMI Group GP, LLC for Credit Management, LP. Document filed by Credit Management, LP..(Little, Brendan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Credit Management, LP..(Little, Brendan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/14/2021) (kv)
June 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit Management, LP answer due 7/1/2021. (kv)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brendan H. Little dated June 10, 2021. Document filed by Credit Management, LP..(Little, Brendan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan Hoffman Little on behalf of Credit Management, LP..(Little, Brendan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Management, LP..(jgo)
May 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Karl Jones. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Anand Kapasi. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jones, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Management, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anand Kapasi..(Jones, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Management, LP, John Does 1-25. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24555908)Document filed by Anand Kapasi..(Jones, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapasi v. Credit Management, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Management, LP
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anand Kapasi
Represented By: Joseph Karl Jones
Represented By: Benjamin Jarret Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?