United States Of America v. United Services Automobile Association
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv04489
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Granted. United Services Automobile Association answer due 7/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/28/2021) (cf)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by United Services Automobile Association. Return Date set for 7/26/2021 at 04:00 PM..(Chrysanthem, Nicholas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas P Chrysanthem on behalf of United Services Automobile Association..(Chrysanthem, Nicholas)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #4 Summons Issued addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Nicholas P. Chrysanthem, Esq. dated June 21, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. United Services Automobile Association answer due 6/28/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2021) (va)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #4 Summons Issued addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Nicholas P. Chrysanthem, Esq. dated June 21, 2021. Document filed by United Services Automobile Association. Return Date set for 6/28/2021 at 03:00 PM..(Hansen, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Services Automobile Association served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Service was accepted by Samantha Guerra - Authorized Employee. Document filed by United States Of America..(Kahane, Joshua)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Services Automobile Association. (vf)
May 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Services Automobile Association, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America..(Kahane, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kahane, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Services Automobile Association. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Police Accident Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - VA Billing Ledger, #3 Exhibit 3 - Billing Notes).(Kahane, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. United Services Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Nicholas P Chrysanthem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?