Salamone v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Frank D. Salamone
Defendant: John Doe # 1 - # 20 and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv04528
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against John Doe # 1 - # 20, United States of America. Document filed by Frank D. Salamone..(Hillgardner, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Frank D. Salamone..(Hillgardner, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Frank D. Salamone..(Hillgardner, Thomas)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas John Hillgardner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas John Hillgardner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 950 (Constitutional - State Statute). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 360 (P.I.: Other). (sj)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hillgardner, Thomas)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against John Doe # 1 - # 20, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24563929)Document filed by Frank D. Salamone..(Hillgardner, Thomas) Modified on 5/20/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salamone v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 1 - # 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D. Salamone
Represented By: Thomas John Hillgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?