Sun et al v. GTV Media Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jia Li Wang, Weiguo Sun, Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yi Li, Mao-Fu Weng, Yan Gao, Ruqin Wang, Jiamei Lu, Xingyu Yan, Weixiang Ge, Shuang Wang, Jun Liu and Ying Liu
Defendant: Wengui Guo, Lihong Wei Lafrenz, Saraca Media Group Inc., GTV Media Group Inc., Sara, Lihong Wei, Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Ho Wan Kwok
Not Yet Classified: Brown Rudnick LLP
Case Number: 1:2021cv04529
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated June 30, 2023 re: Guo Bankruptcy. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 12, 2023 Filing 106 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr on behalf of Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. New Address: Thompson Hine LLP, 300 Madison Avenue, 27th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10017-6232, (212) 344-5680..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 6, 2023 Filing 105 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated June 6, 2023 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: re: #103 Notice (Other) filed by Shuang Wang, Jiamei Lu, Ruqin Wang, Ying Liu, Yi Li, Xingyu Yan, Weixiang Ge, Mao-Fu Weng, Linda He Cheung, Jia Li Wang, Yan Gao, Jun Liu, Teli Chen, Weiguo Sun, ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Steven Block's receipt of ECF notifications. SO ORDERED. Attorney Steven A. Block terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/03/2023) (ama)
May 2, 2023 Filing 103 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal As Counsel. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Block, Steven)
May 2, 2023 Filing 102 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated May 2, 2023 re: Guo Bankruptcy. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
April 7, 2023 Filing 101 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated April 7, 2023 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
March 2, 2023 Filing 100 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian Lanciault dated March 2, 2023 re: Guo Bankruptcy. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by March 3, 2023, Plaintiffs shall file the status letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/28/2023) (ate)
February 6, 2023 Filing 98 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated February 6, 2023 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Adopting REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: for #90 Report and Recommendation. It is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Report is ADOPTED in full. The default judgment against Defaulting Defendants at Dkt. No. 71 is VACATED without prejudice to refiling after the claims against the appearing Defendants are resolved. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/05/2023) (ama)
December 20, 2022 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated December 20, 2022 re: Guo Bankruptcy. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
December 8, 2022 Filing 95 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated December 8, 2022 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
October 20, 2022 Filing 94 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated October 20, 2022 re: Status Update on Guo Bankruptcy Proceeding. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
October 11, 2022 Filing 93 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated October 11, 2022 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
September 22, 2022 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Report and Recommendation dated September 9, 2022 served on Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz on September 22, 2022. Service was made by Federal Express and Email. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - email delivery confirmation).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of the Report and Recommendation on the Defaulting Defendants. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service on the docket by September 28, 2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/20/2022) (ama)
September 9, 2022 Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION For these reasons, the inquest into damages should be consolidated with the damages component of the trial against the appearing Defendants. Alternatively, the default judgment previously entered against defaulting Defendants should be vacated without prejudice to refiling after the claims against appearing Defendants are resolved. See Grazette, 2022 WL 252631, at *3 (denying motion for default judgment with leave to refile after claims against appearing defendants resolved). Objections to R&R due by 9/23/2022 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 9/9/2022) (jca)
August 22, 2022 Filing 89 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated August 22, 2022 re: Status Update on Guo's Bankruptcy Proceeding. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
August 10, 2022 Filing 88 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated August 10, 2022 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 87 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated June 23, 2022 re: Status of Bankruptcy per ECF No. 82. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 13, 2022 Filing 86 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated June 13, 2022 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
April 25, 2022 Filing 85 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault Jr. dated April 25, 2022 re: Status of Bankruptcy per ECF No. 82. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
April 13, 2022 Filing 84 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr dated 04/13/2022 re: Joint Status. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by April 15, 2022, the parties shall file a status letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/13/2022) (tg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by April 24, 2022, and every sixty (60) days thereafter, Plaintiffs shall file a status letter informing the Court of the status of the Bankruptcy Proceeding. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/22/2022) (mml)
February 18, 2022 Filing 81 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Defendant Ho Wan Kwok. Document filed by Brown Rudnick LLP.(Baldiga, William)
February 11, 2022 Filing 80 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated February 11, 2022 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: WHEREAS, the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order dated September 3, 2021 (Dkt. No. 42), scheduled a pre-motion conference on January 28, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. WHEREAS, on October 14, 2021, discovery in this action was stayed while Plaintiffs pursue recovery in connection with the SEC-administered Fair Fund. It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-motion conference scheduled for January 28, 2022, is CANCELLED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/26/2022) (vfr)
December 13, 2021 Filing 78 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated December 13, 2021 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
December 3, 2021 Filing 77 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeffrey S. Gavenman and Aaron A. Mitchell dated December 3, 2021 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by GTV Media Group Inc., Wengui Guo, Saraca Media Group Inc...(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2021 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Scheduling Order for Damages Inquest in the above-referenced action; (2) Plaintiffs Proposed findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in support Default Judgment for Damages against Default Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz; and (3) Declaration of Brian Lanciault, Esq. with exhibits 1-15 annexed thereto in support of Plaintiffs Proposed findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in support Default Judgment for Damages against Default Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz served on Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. on November 15, 2021. Service was made by Federal Express and Email. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - email delivery confirmations).(Lanciault, Brian)
November 15, 2021 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. in Support re: #74 Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Plaintiff Teli Chen, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Plaintiff Linda Cheung, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Plaintiff Yan Gao, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Plaintiff Weixiang Ge, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Plaintiff Yi Li, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Plaintiff Jun Liu, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Plaintiff Ying Liu, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Plaintiff Jiamei Lu, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Plaintiff Weiguo Sun, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Plaintiff Jia Li Wang, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Plaintiff RuQin Wang, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Plaintiff Shuang Wang, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Plaintiff Mao-Fu Weng, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Plaintiff Xingyu Yan).(Lanciault, Brian)
November 15, 2021 Filing 74 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DAMAGES INQUEST: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff shall serve defendants and file Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law concerning all damages and any other monetary relief permitted under the entry of default judgment no later than November 15, 2021. Plaintiff shall include with such service a copy of this Order. The submission shall contain a concluding paragraph that succinctly summarizes what damage amount (or other monetary relief) is being sought, including the exact dollar amount, as further set forth herein. 2. Defendants shall send to plaintiff's counsel and file with the Court their response, if any, to plaintiffs submissions no later than December 6, 2021. 3. The Court hereby notifies the parties that it may conduct this inquest based solely upon the written submissions of the parties, as further set forth herein. 4. A courtesy copy of any document filed with the Court shall be sent or delivered to the undersigned. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/19/2021) (vfr)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #69 Letter Motion to Stay, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated October 8, 2021. The application is GRANTED in part. Discovery will remain stayed while Plaintiffs pursue recovery in connection with the SEC-administered Fair Fund. Defendant Guo's motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. The parties shall submit a joint status letter by December 13, 2021, and every sixty (60) days thereafter, advising the Court on the status of Plaintiffs' ability to recover in connection with the SEC-administered Fair Fund. The parties shall promptly advise the Court when it is determined that discovery can proceed or the case can be dismissed. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/14/2021) (va)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 1/05/2023, Doc. # 97. DEFAULT JUDGMENT: The Court has considered the Order to Show Cause, the supporting papers and evidence, and all other relevant factors and it is hereby: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause is GRANTED. Default Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. (together the "Default Defendants") as to the claims set forth in the Counts I, III, IV, and V of the Complaint A separate referral order for an inquest on damages will issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/14/2021) (mml) Modified on 1/5/2023 (ama).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Inquest After Default/Damages Hearing. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/14/2021) (mml)
October 8, 2021 Filing 69 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated October 8, 2021. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
October 1, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Wengui Guo. Responses due by 10/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion).(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #66 Letter filed by Wengui Guo. ENDORSEMENT: Discovery in this action is stayed pending a decision on Defendant Weingui Guo's motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/28/2021) (tg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 66 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeffrey S. Gavenman dated September 27, 2021 re: Joint Letter Pursuant to Order Entered September 17, 2021. Document filed by Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their submissions in connection with the motion according to the following schedule: By October 1, 2021, Defendant Guo shall file his partial motion to dismiss and memorandum of law in support of the motion; By October 15, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file any opposition; and By October 22, 2021, Defendant shall file any reply. The parties shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding motions, including page limits. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter by September 27, 2021, describing their position(s) as to whether the automatic stay in the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B), applies to stay all discovery in this case pending a decision on Defendant Guo's motion to dismiss. (Motions due by 10/1/2021, Responses due by 10/15/2021, Replies due by 10/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/17/2021) (jca)
September 16, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Order to Show Cause for Default Judgment; (2) Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz; (3) Declaration of Brian Lanciault, Esq. in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibits 1-7 annexed thereto; (4) Declaration of Teli Chen in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (5) Declaration of Linda He Cheung in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (6) Declaration of Yan Gao in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (7) Declaration of Weixiang Ge in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (8) Declaration of Yi Li in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (9) Declaration of Jun Liu in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (10) Declaration of Ying Liu in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (11) Declaration of Jiamei Lu in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (12) Declaration of Weiguo Sun in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (13) Declaration of Lia Li Wang in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (14) Declaration of Ruqin Wang in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (15) Declaration of Shuang Wang in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (16) Declaration of Mao-Fu Weng in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; (17) Declaration of Xingyu Yan in support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause for Default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) as to Defendants Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Lihong Wei Lafrenz with exhibit A annexed thereto; and (18) Plaintiffs Proposed Default Judgment served on Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. on September 14, 2021. Service was made by Federal Express and Email. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - email delivery confirmations).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED that Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. show cause before the Honorable Lorna G. Schofield at conference line 888-363-4749, access code 558-3333 on October 14, 2021, at 11:00 A.M., why a default judgment should not be entered in favor of Plaintiffs for the relief requested in the Complaint; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve, by Federal Express or other overnight delivery, and by email, a copy of this Order, together with Plaintiffs' supporting Declarations and exhibits, on Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc., on or before September 20, 2021 at the following addresses: Lihong Wei Lafrenz: 1673 W Blue Horizon Street, Tucson, Arizona 85704 and 1850 W Orange Grove Road, Tucson, Arizona 85704, sarawei808@gmail.com, help@vog.media, duizhang@vog.media and vog202064@gmail.com; Voice of Guo Media, Inc.: 14747 N Northsight Boulevard, Suite 111 #405, Scottsdale, Arizona 85260; it is further ORDERED that any response by Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. shall be served and filed on or before September 27, 2021; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service, along with the papers upon which this Order to Show Cause is based, on the Court's electronic filing system by October 7, 2021; and Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. are advised that failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause may be grounds for granting a default judgment against them, in which event Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. will have no trial. ( Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2021. Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/13/2021) (mml)
September 10, 2021 Filing 62 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 10, 2021 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/10/2021 (dt).
September 10, 2021 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Xingyu Yan in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Mao-Fu Weng in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Shuang Wang in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Ruqin Wang in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Jia Li Wang in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Weiguo Sun in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Jiamei Lu in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Ying Liu in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Jun Liu in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Yi Li in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Weixiang Ge in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Yan Gao in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Linda He Cheung in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Teli Chen in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wire Transfer).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Motion for Substitute Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order re Motion for Substitute Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Process of Service Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Non Military Certification re Lafrenz, #6 Exhibit 6 - Clerk's Certificate of Default, #7 Exhibit 7 - Clerk's Certificate of Default Certificate of Service).(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #62 Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lanciault, Brian to RE-FILE Document #44 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. ERROR(S): Did not file a Default Judgment. Refer to ECF Rule 16.3. Do not re-file the Order to Show Cause. (dt)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lanciault, Brian to RE-FILE Document #61 Proposed Default Judgment,. ERROR(S): Title of Document. Remove ORDER FOR from the Title of Document. Leave PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (dt)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: ORDERED that the September 9, 2021, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. The parties attention is particularly directed to the provisions for periodic status letters, and the need for a pre-motion letter to avoid cancellation of the final conference and setting of a trial date. It is further. ORDERED, regarding settlement discussions, if and when the parties are ready to proceed with a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge or mediation in the Courts mediation program, they shall file a joint letter on ECF requesting a referral. The parties should be aware that the Court does not extend the deadlines for fact and expert discovery absent compelling circumstances. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/3/2021) (tg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c).The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f). Settlement discussions have not taken place. No additional parties may be joined after 10/22/2021 without leave of court. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2021. Deposition due by 12/17/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/7/2022. Estimate length of trial is 2 weeks. Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/3/2021) (tg) Modified on 9/3/2021 (tg).
September 2, 2021 Filing 41 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeffrey S. Gavenman dated September 2, 2021 re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (submitted per ECF Nos. 29 and 34). Document filed by Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2021 Filing 40 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated September 2, 2021 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, #2 Report and Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Rule 26(f)).(Lanciault, Brian)
August 25, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Clerks Certificate of Default and the Declaration of Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. served on Defendants Lihong Wei Lafrez and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. on August 25, 2021. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 38 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Lihong Wei Lafrenz and Voice of Guo Media, Inc.(km)
August 23, 2021 Filing 37 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 8/23/2021 (km).
August 23, 2021 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. in Support re: #35 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non Military Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Default).(Lanciault, Brian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 35 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 8/23/2021 (km).
August 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Brian Lanciault. RE-FILE Document No. #35 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the clerk's certificate does not match the proof of service. Your proof of service states that the summons and complaint was emailed, please correct your clerk's certificate to match. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (km)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: granting in part #33 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The application is GRANTED in part. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for August 19, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., is adjourned to September 9, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., on the following conference call line: 888-363-4749, access code 558-3333. The parties are reminded that their joint letter and proposed case management plan are due one week prior, or by September 2, 2021. The date for Defendants' submission of a joint letter stating whether (1) they intend to submit motions to dismiss and (2) identifying any overlap in issues between those proposed motions, as set forth at Dkt. No. 29, is adjourned to September 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) (ama)
August 11, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated August 11, 2021. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
July 21, 2021 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan.(Lanciault, Brian)
July 21, 2021 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated July 21, 2021 re: Response to Defendant Guos Pre-Motion Letter (Dkt. 24). Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
July 16, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) a Summons to Lihong Wei Lafrenz; (2) a Summons to Voice of Guo Media, Inc.; (3) a Complaint; (4) Civil Cover Sheet; (5) June 10, 2021 Order of the Hon. Lorna Schofield setting an initial pre-trial conference for July 22, 2021 at 11 AM EST; (6) July 15, 2021 Order of the Hon. Lorna Schofield authorizing Plaintiffs to serve the Summonses and Complaint on you individually, and as the registered agent for Voice of Guo Media, Inc., by email; and (7) copies of Hon. Lorna Schofields Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases served on Lihong Wei Lafrenz (a/k/a Sara, a/k/a Lihong Wei) and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. on July 15, 2021. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - email delivery confirmations).(Lanciault, Brian)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial pre-trial conference in this matter is adjourned to August 19, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., on the following conference call line: 888-363-4749, access code 558-3333. The parties are reminded that their pre-conference materials are due on August 12, 2021. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/16/2021) (cf)
July 15, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. dated July 15, 2021 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Lanciault, Brian)
July 15, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Saraca Media Group Inc...(Mitchell, Aaron)
July 15, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by GTV Media Group Inc...(Mitchell, Aaron)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #20 Motion re: #20 MOTION for Substitute Service . It is herebyORDERED that, pursuant to NYCPLR 308(5) and 311(b), by July 20, 2021, Plaintiffs shall serve the summons, complaint and a copy of this Order by email to VOG and to Lafrenz, individually and as VOG's registered agent, at the following addresses: sarawei808@gmail.com, help@vog.media, duizhang@vog.media and vog202064@gmail.com. It is further ORDERED that by July 20, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service by email. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requests for service by Discord message are denied without prejudice to renewal in the event they can provide sufficient proof that Lafrenz regularly uses and maintains the "@Sara#0821" or other Discord account. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' alternative requests for service by newspaper publication and an extension of the service deadline are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the docket entry at number 20. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/15/2021) (cf)
July 15, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeffrey S. Gavenman dated July 14, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter Regarding Proposed Partial Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Wengui Guo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gavenman Decl., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Gavenman Decl.).(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Substitute Service on Defendants Wei Lafrez and Voice of Guo Media, Inc., Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Substitute Service on Defendants Wei Lafrez and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. and Declaration of Brian Lanciault, Esq. in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Substitute Service on Defendants Wei Lafrez and Voice of Guo Media, Inc. served on Defendants GTV Media Group Inc., Saraca Media Group Inc. and Wengui Guo on July 12, 2021. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Brian P. Lanciault, Jr. in Support re: #20 MOTION for Substitute Service .. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit B - VOG ACC Corporate Records, #3 Exhibit C - VOG Answer Signed by Beauchamp, #4 Exhibit D - Rule 4(d) Letters and Confirmations, #5 Exhibit E - Sample Discord Message).(Lanciault, Brian)
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION for Substitute Service . . Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
July 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Substitute Service . Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order for Initial Conference (ECF No. 16) and The Honorable Lorna G. Schofields Individual Practice Rules and Individual Practice Rules in Light of COVID-19 served on Defendants on July 15, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated by agreement between the undersigned counsel of record that Defendants GTV Media Group, Inc., Saraca Media Group, Inc., and Wengui Guo ("Defendants") have accepted service of process in this action, effective May 24, 2021. It is further stipulated by agreement between the undersigned counsel of record that Defendants shall respond to the complaint no later than July 14, 2021. The application is GRANTED. By July 14, 2021, Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The parties' attention is directed to the requirement for pre-motion letters per the Individual Rules. GTV Media Group Inc. answer due 7/14/2021; Wengui Guo answer due 7/14/2021; Saraca Media Group Inc. answer due 7/14/2021., Motions terminated: #17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . filed by Wengui Guo. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/14/2021) (cf)
June 12, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/10/2021) (cf)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Steven A. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Wengui Guo served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Service was accepted by Edwin Acosta, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Xingyu Yan; Ruqin Wang; Linda He Cheung; Weiguo Sun; Yi Li; Mao-Fu Weng; Jia Li Wang; Weixiang Ge; Yan Gao; Ying Liu; Teli Chen; Jiamei Lu; Shuang Wang; Jun Liu..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Saraca Media Group Inc. served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Service was accepted by Mack Robertson, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Xingyu Yan; Ruqin Wang; Linda He Cheung; Weiguo Sun; Yi Li; Mao-Fu Weng; Jia Li Wang; Weixiang Ge; Yan Gao; Ying Liu; Teli Chen; Jiamei Lu; Shuang Wang; Jun Liu..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. GTV Media Group Inc. served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Service was accepted by Mack Robertson, Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Xingyu Yan; Ruqin Wang; Linda He Cheung; Weiguo Sun; Yi Li; Mao-Fu Weng; Jia Li Wang; Weixiang Ge; Yan Gao; Ying Liu; Teli Chen; Jiamei Lu; Shuang Wang; Jun Liu..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Steven A. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24587075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Local 1.3 affidavit Ex. A Certificate of Admission for Steven Block, #3 Proposed Order).(Block, Steven)
May 25, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Steven A. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24587075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wengui Guo. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Voice of Guo Media, Inc.. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lihong Wei Lafrenz. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GTV Media Group Inc.. (sj)
May 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
May 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wengui Guo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Voice of Guo Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lihong Wei Lafrenz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GTV Media Group Inc. and Saraca Media Group Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teli Chen, Linda He Cheung, Yan Gao, Weixiang Ge, Yi Li, Jun Liu, Ying Liu, Jiamei Lu, Weiguo Sun, Jia Li Wang, Ruqin Wang, Shuang Wang, Mao-Fu Weng, Xingyu Yan..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lanciault, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GTV Media Group Inc., Wengui Guo, Lihong Wei Lafrenz, Saraca Media Group Inc., Voice of Guo Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24563934)Document filed by Xingyu Yan, Ruqin Wang, Linda He Cheung, Weiguo Sun, Yi Li, Mao-Fu Weng, Jia Li Wang, Weixiang Ge, Yan Gao, Ying Liu, Teli Chen, Jiamei Lu, Shuang Wang, Jun Liu..(Lanciault, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun et al v. GTV Media Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wengui Guo
Represented By: Jeffrey Samuel Gavenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lihong Wei Lafrenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saraca Media Group Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Aubrey Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTV Media Group Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Aubrey Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lihong Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voice of Guo Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho Wan Kwok
Represented By: Jeffrey Samuel Gavenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jia Li Wang
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weiguo Sun
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teli Chen
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda He Cheung
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Li
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mao-Fu Weng
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Gao
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruqin Wang
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiamei Lu
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xingyu Yan
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weixiang Ge
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuang Wang
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Liu
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ying Liu
Represented By: Brian Philip Lanciault, Jr
Represented By: Steven A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Brown Rudnick LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?