Krebs v. Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Krebs
Defendant: Sequa Corporation, The Carlyle Group, Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Chromalloy, Inc. and Brian Costa
Case Number: 1:2021cv04564
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 8/4/2021 at 10:30 AM through video conference. (sb)
June 17, 2021 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/19/2021.(ah)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) scheduled for June 29, 2021 is adjourned to August 17, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. The parties shall submit the joint letter referenced in the Court's May 25, 2021 Order, Dkt. 6, by August 10, 2021. Initial Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/14/2021) (nb)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (jpt)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Chromalloy, Inc., Brian Costa, Sequa Corporation, The Carlyle Group..(Samaro, Samuel)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter, filed by Brian Costa, Chromalloy, Inc., The Carlyle Group, Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Sequa Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is granted. Defendants shall have until June 11, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. So Ordered. Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC answer due 6/11/2021; Chromalloy, Inc. answer due 6/11/2021; Brian Costa answer due 6/11/2021; Sequa Corporation answer due 6/11/2021; The Carlyle Group answer due 6/11/2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/25/2021) (js)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 29, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. SO ORDERED. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/25/2021) (vfr)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Samuel J. Samaro dated 5/25/2021 re: Consensual Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Chromalloy, Inc., Brian Costa, Sequa Corporation, The Carlyle Group..(Samaro, Samuel)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Diederich, Jr on behalf of Timothy Krebs..(Diederich, Michael)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yelena Yukhvid on behalf of Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Chromalloy, Inc., Brian Costa, Sequa Corporation, The Carlyle Group..(Yukhvid, Yelena)
May 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samuel J. Samaro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Samaro, Samuel)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Rockland County. Case Number: 031871/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24571016).Document filed by The Carlyle Group, Sequa Corporation, Chromalloy, Inc., Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC, Brian Costa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B).(Samaro, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krebs v. Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Krebs
Represented By: Michael David Diederich, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequa Corporation
Represented By: Samuel J. Samaro
Represented By: Yelena Yukhvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Carlyle Group
Represented By: Samuel J. Samaro
Represented By: Yelena Yukhvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC
Represented By: Samuel J. Samaro
Represented By: Yelena Yukhvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chromalloy, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel J. Samaro
Represented By: Yelena Yukhvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Costa
Represented By: Samuel J. Samaro
Represented By: Yelena Yukhvid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?