Jones v. Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Khmari Jones
Defendant: Asiye Bodur, Katara [Last Name Unknown], Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, XYZ Corp. 1-10, Stephanie Pompee, John and Jane Does 1-10 and Asiye Killic
Case Number: 1:2021cv04572
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, Asiye Bodur, Stephanie Pompee, Katara [Last Name Unknown]. (vf)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, Asiye Bodur a/k/a Asiye Killic, Katara [Last Name Unknown], and Stephanie Pompee, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Khmari Jones..(Dermesropian, Rudy)
May 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Rudy Artin Dermesropian to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, Asiye Bodur a/k/a Asiye Killic, Katara [Last Name Unknown], Stephanie Pompee, John and Jane Does 1-10, XYZ Corp. 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Khmari Jones..(Dermesropian, Rudy) Modified on 5/25/2021 (sj).
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dermesropian, Rudy)
May 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Rudy Artin Dermesropian to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; the Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Rudy Artin Dermesropian to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dermesropian, Rudy) Modified on 5/24/2021 (jgo).
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, Asiye Bodur a/k/a Asiye Killic, Katara [Last Name Unknown], Stephanie Pompee, John and Jane Does 1-10, XYZ Corp. 1-10, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Khmari Jones..(Dermesropian, Rudy) Modified on 5/24/2021 (jgo).
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC, Asiye Bodur(Individual Capacity), Asiye Bodur(Official Capacity), John and Jane Does 1-10(Individual Capacity), John and Jane Does 1-10(Official Capacity), Stephanie Pompee(Individual Capacity), Stephanie Pompee(Official Capacity), XYZ Corp. 1-10, Katara [Last Name Unknown](Official Capacity), Katara [Last Name Unknown](Individual Capacity). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24572491)Document filed by Khmari Jones..(Dermesropian, Rudy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asiye Bodur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katara [Last Name Unknown]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Medical Clinic of New York, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pompee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asiye Killic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khmari Jones
Represented By: Rudy Artin Dermesropian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?