Resnik v. Rite Aid of New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Resnik
Defendant: DRI I, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Rite Aid of New York City, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Duane Reade, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04609
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E533710053693 on 7/13/2021..(kv)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #28 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, in favor of Amy Resnik against CVS Pharmacy, Inc., DRI I, Inc., Duane Reade, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Kolmar Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of New York City, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated July 12, 2021, the Court grants plaintiff's motion to remand and denies plaintiff's motion for costs. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/12/2021) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #16 Motion to Remand to State Court. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS plaintiff's motion to remand and DENIES plaintiff's motion for costs. Clerk to enter judgment. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/12/2021) (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jason P. Weinstein in Support re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Amy Resnik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 -- Leek Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 9 -- Mittenthal Deposition Excerpts).(Weinstein, Jason)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Amy Resnik..(Weinstein, Jason)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Cullen McCaffrey on behalf of Kolmar Laboratories, Inc...(McCaffrey, Kevin)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Thomas P. Kurland in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 8, 1980 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B Process Specification [JNJ000298169], #3 Exhibit C Deposition excerpts of R. Edmonds, on November 16-17, 2020, #4 Exhibit D Deposition excerpts of B. Leek, on October 6, 2020, #5 Exhibit E Deposition excerpts of E. Kausmeyer, on October 21, 2020, #6 Exhibit F Deposition excerpts of J. Mittenthal, on August 14, 2020, #7 Exhibit G Windsor Minerals, Inc., Consolidated Income Statement, #8 Exhibit H Deposition excerpts of R. Yakupcin, on January 23-24, 2020, #9 Exhibit I Process Specification [JNJ000298185], #10 Exhibit J Report of CTFA Talc Subcommittee, #11 Exhibit K November 3,1981 Memorandum, #12 Exhibit L October 14,1982 Memorandum, #13 Exhibit M Deposition excerpts of P. Locatell, on July 7, 2020, #14 Exhibit N - Complaint (No. 17-4034(FLW) (D.N.J.)).(Kurland, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc...(Kurland, Thomas)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/21/2021. This case is stayed until the Motion to Remand is decided. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #20 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending transfer to MDL 2738. . Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H Part 1 - NYCAL CMO, #2 Exhibit H Part 2 - NYCAL CMO).(Kurland, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #20 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending transfer to MDL 2738. . Document filed by Amy Resnik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- MOL in Support of Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 -- April 23, 2021 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Silverman v Brenntag).(Weinstein, Jason)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending transfer to MDL 2738. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL 2738 10/4/16 Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - 5/26/17 Stay Order (17-cv-3308), #3 Exhibit C - 5/7/18 Stay Order (18-cv-2152), #4 Exhibit D - 9/20/16 Stay Order (16-cv-134), #5 Exhibit E - CTO-257 (MDL 2738), #6 Exhibit F- Opposition to CTO-257 (MDL 2738), #7 Exhibit G - JPML Briefing Schedule (MDL 2738)).(Kurland, Thomas)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 6-21- 2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/7/2021) (kv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jason P. Weinstein in Support re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Amy Resnik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(Weinstein, Jason)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Amy Resnik..(Weinstein, Jason)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Amy Resnik..(Weinstein, Jason)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Corporate Parent Walgreen Co. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. Document filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Rite Aid of New York, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. Document filed by Rite Aid of New York, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Duane Reade, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Corporate Parent Walgreen Co. for Duane Reade, Inc.. Document filed by Duane Reade, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc...(Murdica, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Peter Weinstein on behalf of Amy Resnik..(Weinstein, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Attorneys for Plaintiffs and Defendants and Kolmar Laboratories, Inc. on May 21, 2021 and May 24, 2021. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc...(Kurland, Thomas)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc...(Kurland, Thomas)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc...(Kurland, Thomas)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Johnson & Johnson..(Kurland, Thomas)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kurland, Thomas)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 190071/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24575458).Document filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B, CVS Consent, #3 Exhibit C, Duane Reade Consent, #4 Exhibit D, Gavin Opinion).(Kurland, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resnik v. Rite Aid of New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Resnik
Represented By: Jason Peter Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRI I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Reade, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolmar Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Cullen McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Murdica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?