Ravikant v. Rohde, MD et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Kamal RAVIKANT and Kamal Ravikant
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, Dr. Joseph P. Alukal, Dr. Jarrod Bogue, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Dr. Christine H. Rohde, MD, Christine H. Rohde, MD, Joseph P. Alukal and Jarrod Bogue
Case Number: 1:2021cv04758
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ona T Wang
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Case Management Conference held on 7/27/2021. (Quinn, Diane)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The Court will hold a Status Conference in this matter telephonically on Wednesday, October 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/27/2021) (rro)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 21, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (ECF 9) is hereby adjourned to July 27, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (kds)
July 15, 2021 Filing 26 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant..(Stein, Steven)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Pursuant to ECF 9, the parties' proposed case management plan is due Wednesday, July 14, 2021. (ECF 9 at 2). No extension is necessary. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order) (kds)
July 6, 2021 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Robert J. Cecala dated July 6, 2021. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Cecala, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Mail).(Cecala, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr on behalf of Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center..(Cecala, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 21 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center..(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 20 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr on behalf of Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Mail).(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Mail).(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Mail).(Cecala, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Mail).(Cecala, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(jgo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHRISTINE H. ROHDE, M.D., JOSEPH P. ALUKAL, M.D., JARROD BOGUE, M.D., COLUMBIA DOCTORS FACULTY PRACTICE GROUP OF THE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IRVING MEDICAL CENTER AND THE NEW YORK AND PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL,, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant..(Leav, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter filed by Kamal Ravikant. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to contact the Southern District of New York's Clerk's Office regarding the summons. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/11/2021) (vfr)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Daniel T. Leav dated June 10, 2021 re: Summons. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant..(Leav, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(pc)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held telephonically on Wednesday, July 21, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. (Initial Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/2/2021) (rro)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christine H. Rohde, MD, Joseph P. Alukal, MD, Jarrod Bogue, MD, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center nd The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant..(Stein, Steven)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Bruce Stein to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error, the defendant name listed " Columbia Doctors" does not correspond to pleading caption; and the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christine H. Rohde, MD, Joseph P. Alukal, MD, Jarrod Bogue, MD, Columbia Doctors and The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant.(Stein, Steven) Modified on 6/2/2021 (vf).
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Joseph P. Alukal, Jarrod Bogue, Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center, Christine H. Rohde, MD, The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. Document filed by Kamal Ravikant..(Stein, Steven)
May 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive motion (i.e., motionrequiring Report and Recommendation) All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/30/2021) (rro)
May 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Bruce Stein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Bruce Stein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
May 28, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel T Leav to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name must exactly match what is listed on the complaint caption title " Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center";. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 28, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel T Leav on behalf of Kamal RAVIKANT..(Leav, Daniel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stein, Steven)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christine H. Rohde, MD, Joseph P. Alukal, MD, Jarrod Bogue, MD, Columbia Doctors and The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kamal RAVIKANT..(Stein, Steven) Modified on 5/28/2021 (pc).
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24597931)Document filed by Kamal RAVIKANT..(Stein, Steven) Modified on 5/28/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravikant v. Rohde, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Kamal RAVIKANT
Represented By: Steven Bruce Stein
Represented By: Daniel T Leav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamal Ravikant
Represented By: Daniel T Leav
Represented By: Steven Bruce Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph P. Alukal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jarrod Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Doctors Faculty Practice Group of the Columbia University Irving Medical Center
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christine H. Rohde, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine H. Rohde, MD
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Alukal
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Bogue
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cecala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?