Gold IP LLC v. Augury Inc.
Plaintiff: Gold IP LLC
Defendant: Augury Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04788
Filed: May 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. Additionally, the parties are hereby ORDERED to submit via email (WoodsNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in PDF format at least one week before the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gregory-h-woods). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a joint letter to the Court advising the Court on the status of the case at least one week before the initial pretrial conference. The letter should be filed on ECF in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules using the filing event "Letter." The status letter should not exceed six pages and should include the following as further set forth in this Order. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 15, 2021. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: September 22, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/2/21) (yv)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ramey, William)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Augury Inc...(pc)
June 1, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
June 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Augury Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gold IP LLC..(Hoffman, David)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Augury Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24604243)Document filed by Gold IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US6848314, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold IP LLC v. Augury Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold IP LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augury Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?