Bank Leumi USA v. Trade Finance Trust et al
Interpleader: Girobank International, N.V., Alexander Lawson, Girobank, N.V., TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd., Bank Leumi USA, TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC, IIG Trade Finance, LLC, Christopher Kennedy, valerie maria, Trade Finance Trust, Valerie P. Maria and IIG Bank (Malta) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04830
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 29, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02890-LAK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
June 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Gerard Ahern on behalf of TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd., TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC..(Ahern, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew R Kissner on behalf of TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd., TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC..(Kissner, Andrew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Charles Haims on behalf of TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd., TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC..(Haims, Joel)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jordan D. Weinreich, Esq. in Support re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Malta Bank Letter).(Weinreich, Jordan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Jordan D. Weinreich, Esq. in Support re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Malta Bank Letter).(Weinreich, Jordan) Modified on 6/2/2021 (dt).
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-2890. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA..(Weinreich, Jordan) Modified on 6/2/2021 (vf).
June 2, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly related to 21-cv-2890. (vf)
June 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jordan Weinreich to RE-FILE Document #7 Affirmation in Support. Use the event type Declaration in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jordan Derek Weinreich to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry is not the official IH-32 related case statement form. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jordan Derek Weinreich, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
June 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jordan Derek Weinreich re: Document No. #1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading (IIG Bank (Malta) LTD.) were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (vf)
June 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jordan Weinreich to Do Not RE-FILE Document #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. ERROR(S): Did not file Declaration. Separately file the Declaration using the event type Declaration in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt)
June 2, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents IIG Bank (Malta) Ltd. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Weinreich, Jordan)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinreich, Jordan)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Leumi Le-Israel B.M., Corporate Parent Bank Leumi Le-Israel Corp. for Bank Leumi USA. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA..(Weinreich, Jordan)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF FUNDS IN INTEREST BEARING ACCOUNT. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Weinreich, Jordan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Weinreich, Jordan) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Girobank International, N.V., Girobank, N.V., IIG Trade Finance, LLC, Christopher Kennedy, Alexander Lawson, Trade Finance Trust, TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd., TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC, Valerie P. Maria. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24609245)Document filed by Bank Leumi USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint from related interpleader action, #2 Exhibit B - Judge Kaplan Interpleader Order, #3 Exhibit C - Judge Cote Order, #4 Exhibit D - Judge Wiles Order, #5 Exhibit E - Account Closure letter, #6 Exhibit F - Malta Bank Letter, #7 Exhibit G - David Hu counsel letter).(Weinreich, Jordan)
June 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Document No. #3 Proposed Order for Deposit of Funds in Interest Bearing Account was reviewed and approved as to form. (cde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Leumi USA v. Trade Finance Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Girobank International, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Alexander Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Girobank, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: TriLinc Global Impact Fund - Trade Finance, Ltd.
Represented By: Joel Charles Haims
Represented By: Andrew R Kissner
Represented By: Michael Gerard Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Bank Leumi USA
Represented By: Jordan Derek Weinreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: TriLinc Global Impact Fund, LLC
Represented By: Joel Charles Haims
Represented By: Andrew R Kissner
Represented By: Michael Gerard Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: IIG Trade Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Christopher Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: valerie maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Trade Finance Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Valerie P. Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: IIG Bank (Malta) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?