Perez v. Oxford University et al
Plaintiff: Eric Andrew Perez
Defendant: Astra Zeneca LP, Oxford University, Dr. Melanie Jay, Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Dr. Martina A. Parauda and Dr. Mark J. Mulligan
Case Number: 1:2021cv04844
Filed: May 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 mm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/26/2021) (ama)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Astra Zeneca LP served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021; Melanie Jay, served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021; Oxford University served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. Service was accepted by Veterans Affairs Harbor Healthcare for Dr.Melanie Jay ; University of Oxford Offices, Wellington Square, Oxford Ox 1250, UK. Service was made by Mail to Astra Zeneca Lp. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2021: #1 Errata) (sc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2021: #2 Errata) (sc).
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Astrazeneca AB, served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021; Mark J. Mulligan served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. Service was accepted by Veterans Affairs Harbor Healthcare for Dr. Mark Mulligan; Astro Zenca AB, Forskargatan 18k, Sodertaljt, Sweden;. Service was made by Mail for Astra Zeneca Pharmaceuticals. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2021: #1 Errata) (sc).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Eric Andrew Perez 421 8th Ave. Unit #93 New York, NY 10116, at, on 7/21/2021 Re: #11 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astra Zeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, Melanie Jay, Mark J. Mulligan, Oxford University, Martina A. Parauda. (aan)
July 21, 2021 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 7/21/2021 Re: Judge Alison J. Nathan #11 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Astra Zeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, Melanie Jay, Mark J. Mulligan, Martina A. Parauda. (aan)
July 21, 2021 Mailed a copy of #12 Summons Issued, #2 Complaint to University of Oxford University Offices Wellington Square Oxford OX12JD United Kingdom via Federal Express AIRBILL # 865863906421. (aan)
July 21, 2021 Mailed a copy of #12 Summons Issued, #2 Complaint to AstraZeneca AB Forskargatan 18 SE-15185 Sodertalje Sweden via Federal Express AIRBILL # 865863906432. (aan)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. Plaintiff's request for an order to show cause (ECF 8) is denied. The Clerk of Court is also directed to (1) complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Mark J. Mulligan, Dr. Melanie Jay, and Dr. Martina A. Parauda; (2) check the box on the USM-285 forms labeled "Check for service on U.S.A."; (3) issue summonses; and (4) deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service on these defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to send copies of the summonses and complaint to University of Oxford and AstraZeneca AB by certified mail, return receipt requested, or Federal Express. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/19/2021) (vfr) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Eric Perez IN SUPPORT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, re: #8 Order to Show Cause - Unsigned. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 (UNSIGNED) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
July 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff submits a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") on appeal (ECF No. 1). This submission is construed as a request for IFP status in this Court. Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/14/2021) (sac)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from E. Perez, dated 7/12/21 re: I am writing this letter to ascertain the assignment of a judge to this case. Although the Court is in Summer session and operating at a reduced capacity, this delay only proves the collusion of a foreign entity and government against the American people an a cover-up ofthe doctoring of study results and pay-offs. Plaintiff Perez is demanding the assignment of a fair and impartial judge and asks that his file be correected as he has also demanded a jury trial. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez.(sc)
June 28, 2021 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Eric Andrew Perez at 421 8th Ave., Unit #93, New York, NY 10116 on 6/28/2021. (sha)
June 26, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from E. Perez dated 6/26/21 re: I am writing this letter to ascertain the status of these cases. I have not received any communications from the Court in reference to these cases. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez.(sc)
June 26, 2021 Request for Copies of updated Docket Sheet Received: Re (74 in 1:20-cv-09119-PAE-JLC, 5 in 1:21-cv-04844-UA) Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Eric Perez received on 6/26/21. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
May 31, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sac)
May 31, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Eric Andrew Perez consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sac)
May 31, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Astra Zeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Melanie Jay, Mark J. Mulligan, Oxford University, Martina A. Parauda. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac)
May 31, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sac)
May 31, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Oxford University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Zeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Melanie Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Martina A. Parauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mark J. Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Andrew Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?