Smith v. Urban Health Plan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Debra Smith
Defendant: Urban Health Plan Inc., Marie Plantin, PA-C and United States
Case Number: 1:2021cv04974
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, by their respective counsel, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), as follows: 1. The United States is hereby substituted as defendant in place of Urban Health Center, Inc. and Marie Plantin. 2. Plaintiff's claims against the United States are dismissed without prejudice. 3. This Stipulation and Order of Dismissal (the "Stipulation and Order") may be executed in counterparts; a reproduced signature shall have the same force and effect as an original signature; and a facsimile or electronic copy of the Stipulation and Order shall have the same force and effect as an original. 4. The undersigned parties understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the undersigned parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. SO ORDERED., United States added. Urban Health Plan Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/8/2021) (rj)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Marie Plantin, PA-C, Urban Health Plan Inc...(Cowart, Brandon)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brandon Cowart dated June 10, 2021., #1 Notice of Removal. SO ORDERED. Marie Plantin, PA-C answer due 7/12/2021; Urban Health Plan Inc. answer due 7/12/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/11/2021) (nb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Brandon Cowart dated June 10, 2021. Document filed by Marie Plantin, PA-C, Urban Health Plan Inc...(Cowart, Brandon)
June 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
June 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24058/2013E..Document filed by Marie Plantin, PA-C, Urban Health Plan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Employment Certification).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Urban Health Plan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Health Plan Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Plantin, PA-C
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?